Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020591

EP2020591 - Displacement measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.09.2014
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.10.2014  [2014/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mori Seiki Co., Ltd.
106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamato-Koriyama City
Nara 639-1160 / JP
[2014/26]
Former [2010/43]For all designated states
Magnescale Co., Ltd.
Shinagawa Intercity Tower A-18F 2-15-1 Konan Minatu-ku
Tokyo 108-6018 / JP
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kon, Masahito
c/o SONY MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1-10, Kiyoku-cho
Kuki-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Taniguchi, Kayoko
c/o SONY MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1-10, Kiyoku-cho
Kuki-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Tamiya, Hideaki
c/o SONY MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1-10, Kiyoku-cho
Kuki-shi, Saitama / JP
04 / Onodera, Yasuhiko
c/o SONY MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1-10, Kiyoku-cho
Kuki-shi, Saitama / JP
05 / Tsuchiya, Hideki
c/o SONY MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1-10, Kiyoku-cho
Kuki-shi, Saitama / JP
06 / Kuroda, Akihiro
c/o SONY MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS CORPORATION 1-10, Kiyoku-cho
Kuki-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date08012121.304.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateJP2007020128301.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007201283
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020591
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020591
Date:09.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/56, G01D5/58
[2009/06]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2014/25]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verschiebungsmesser[2009/06]
English:Displacement measuring apparatus[2009/06]
French:Appareil de mesure de déplacement[2009/06]
Examination procedure10.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/42]
22.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0013799  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * pages 1-46; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]GB2230666  (MITUTOYO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * pages 1-19; claims 1-9 *;
 [X]WO8911080  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * pages 1-14 *;
 [X]JP2004028905  (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0096] - [0124] *;
 [A]US2002021450  (AOKI TOSHIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0043] - [0098] *
by applicantJP2007201283
 JP2002267493
 JP2006177876