Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022884

EP2022884 - Dispensing unit for a washing machine and washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2010
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Miele & Cie. KG
Carl-Miele-Strasse 29
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Finke, Michael
Buschweg 17
33161 Hövelhof / DE
02 / Müther, Robert
Mönchstrasse 17a
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
 [2009/07]
Application number, filing date08012188.205.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateDE2007103600730.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007036007
[2009/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022884
Date:11.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022884
Date:21.10.2009
Language:DE
[2009/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/02
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Einspülvorrichtung für eine Waschmaschine und Waschmaschine[2009/07]
English:Dispensing unit for a washing machine and washing machine[2009/07]
French:Distributeur de détergent pour un lave-linge et lave-linge[2009/07]
Examination procedure22.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
19.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2009Fee for grant paid
03.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
MT21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
TR21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT21.03.2010
HU22.04.2010
LU05.07.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
MT21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT21.03.2010
HU22.04.2010
LU05.07.2010
Former [2012/42]CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
MT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT21.03.2010
HU22.04.2010
Former [2012/41]CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
MT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT21.03.2010
Former [2011/29]CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
MT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
Former [2011/25]CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
MT21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
Former [2010/44]CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
IE21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
NO21.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
Former [2010/28]CY21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
HR21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
NO21.01.2010
IS21.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE10122514  (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1260629  (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] *;
 [A]DE20004244U  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 4 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]DE19842095  (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102006002400  (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] * * figures 1-7 *
by applicantEP1260629
 DE20004244U