Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020641

EP2020641 - RFID tag information communicating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Kato, Takaaki
c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678561 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Mitsuru
c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678561 / JP
 [2013/37]
Former [2009/06]01 / Kato, Takaaki
c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678561 / JP
02 / Nakamura, Mitsuru
c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 4678561 / JP
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Former [2009/06]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date08012632.911.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateJP2007020171002.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007201710
JP2007020170902.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007201709
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020641
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020641
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06K17/00, G06K7/10
[2013/16]
Former International [2009/06]G06K7/08
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2009/41]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Übermittlung von RFID-Etiketten-Daten[2009/06]
English:RFID tag information communicating apparatus[2009/06]
French:Appareil de communication d'informations d'étiquette RFID[2009/06]
Examination procedure03.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
05.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR
14.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2013Fee for grant paid
30.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2011
Opposition(s)12.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE11.09.2013
SE11.09.2013
[2014/18]
Former [2014/09]SE11.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005140511  (BONNELL CLAYTON [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0042] *
by applicantJP2007108893