Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027813

EP2027813 - Head-coupled holder for living body optical measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2015
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.09.2015  [2015/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kiguchi, Masashi
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Matsushima, Naoki
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Atsumori, Hirokazu
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group
12F, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
 [2014/14]
Former [2009/09]01 / Kiguchi, Masashi
Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Matsushima, Naoki
Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Atsumori, Hirokazu
Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2014/36]
Former [2009/09]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08012937.217.07.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateJP2007021491921.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007214919
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027813
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2027813
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Am Kopf koppelbarer Halter zur optischen Messung am lebenden Körper[2009/09]
English:Head-coupled holder for living body optical measurement[2009/09]
French:Supportà couplage de tête pour la mesure optique d'un corps vivant[2013/38]
Former [2009/09]Support à couplage de tête pour la mesure optique d'un corps vivant
Examination procedure20.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
26.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
01.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.07.2014Fee for grant paid
10.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2009
Opposition(s)04.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT03.09.2014
[2015/37]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP1407711  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0039]; figure 22 * [A] 3,8;
 [A]US2004054271  (MAKI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,8 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0087]; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP1447049  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,8 * figures 9,10 *
by applicantJPH09149894
 JP2000172407
 JP2002172106