Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025791

EP2025791 - Apparatus for dyeing delicate garments with double basket [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]Apparatus for dyeing and/or washing delicate garments with double basket
[2009/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avantec Costruzioni Meccaniche Srl
Via dell'artigianato 24
36064 Villaraspa di Mason (IV) / IT
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Dalla Valle, Vittorio
Via Donizetti, 9
36030 Lugo di Vicenza (VI) / IT
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Massa, Patrizia
D'Agostini Group S.r.l. Viale Mazzini 142
00195 Roma / IT
[2009/08]
Application number, filing date08013079.221.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateIT2007TV0013709.08.2007         Original published format: IT TV20070137
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025791
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025791
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:D06B5/24, D06B5/26, D06F23/00, D06B23/00
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Gerät zum Färben von empfindlicher Kleidung mit doppeltem Korb[2009/40]
English:Apparatus for dyeing delicate garments with double basket[2009/40]
French:Appareil de teinture de linge délicat doté d'une double corbeille[2009/40]
Former [2009/08]Gerät zum Färben und/oder Waschen von empfindlicher Kleidung mit doppeltem Korb
Former [2009/08]Apparatus for dyeing and/or washing delicate garments with double basket
Former [2009/08]Appareil de teinture et/ou de lavage de linge délicat doté d'une double corbeille
Examination procedure24.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
12.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2010Fee for grant paid
04.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201003   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2010
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
HU08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
TR08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
IE21.07.2011
LU21.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
TR08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
IE21.07.2011
LU21.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
Former [2013/25]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
IE21.07.2011
LU21.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
Former [2012/35]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
IE21.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
Former [2012/22]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
MC31.07.2011
FR01.08.2011
Former [2012/12]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/05]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
MT08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
Former [2011/47]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
DK08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
Former [2011/37]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
PL08.12.2010
RO08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
SK08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
Former [2011/35]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
CZ08.12.2010
EE08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
IS08.04.2011
PT08.04.2011
Former [2011/34]AT08.12.2010
BE08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
GR09.03.2011
ES19.03.2011
PT08.04.2011
Former [2011/29]AT08.12.2010
CY08.12.2010
FI08.12.2010
HR08.12.2010
LT08.12.2010
LV08.12.2010
NL08.12.2010
SE08.12.2010
SI08.12.2010
BG08.03.2011
NO08.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US4711104  (IKEDA YOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claim 1 * * abstract *;
 [X]US5950459  (TAKAGI SHINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US2986916  (JOHN BOCHAN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3740929  (VAHLDIEK JUERGEN) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0240762  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2718694  (MC GRAW EDISON CO) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2002017118
 US5950459
 JP2004060107
 US4111104
 US2986916