Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022655

EP2022655 - Control apparatus of a variable damping force damper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.11.2010  [2010/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sekiya, Shigenobu
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Prechtel, Jörg , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013113.921.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateJP2007020620308.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007206203
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022655
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022655
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/08, B60G17/0165, B60G17/018, // F16F9/53
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuervorrichtung für einen Stoßdämpfer mit unterschiedlicher Dämpfung[2009/07]
English:Control apparatus of a variable damping force damper[2009/07]
French:Appareil de contrôle d'un amortisseur à forme d'amortissement variable[2009/07]
Examination procedure21.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
24.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.05.2009Fee for grant paid
28.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45]
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2006224285  (IZAWA MASAKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1,2 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0056]; figure - *;
 [A]JP2006273222  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012] *;
 [A]JP2006281876  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]JP2006321258  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [A]JPS611520  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]US5377107  (SHIMIZU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0151421  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH0648142  (UNISIA JECS CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0490915  (NIPPON DENSO CO) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH1178467  (TOKICO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2005178628  (UCHINO TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0114]; figure 27 *
by applicantUS2006224285
 JPH0725257
 JPH06278638
 JP2007206203