blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2051303 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2051303



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 200
09.05.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.07.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.06.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
18.05.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.04.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.04.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
05.04.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 15
06.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.09.2016 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
20.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
25.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
25.08.2014 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
05.08.2014 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.05.2014 Invitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative and to file an authorisation Search / examination 2
08.03.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.09.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
10.06.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee after re-establishment of rights Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Request for re-establishment of rights allowed Search / examination 1
18.04.2011 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
17.04.2011 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.09.2010 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
31.07.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.07.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.07.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2009 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
28.06.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.06.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.05.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.05.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 Application refused (no designation of inventor filed) Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.03.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.11.2008 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
06.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.11.2008 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.10.2008 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.10.2008 Priority document Search / examination 38
30.09.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
24.07.2008 Description Search / examination 9
24.07.2008 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6