blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2051303


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
11.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
13.07.2017 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
31.05.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.04.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.03.2017 Change - French title published on  12.04.2017  [2017/15]
13.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.07.2015 Definitive list of designations published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
21.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
22.05.2015 Request for examination filed published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
14.11.2014 Publication of search report published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Change - classification published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Change - classification published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
02.10.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
02.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Change - representative published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
30.08.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
16.05.2014 Change - representative published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
08.10.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
08.10.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.08.2013 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
06.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.07.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
04.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.03.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.08.2010 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
31.07.2009 Change - inventor published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
17.07.2009 Change - inventor published on  19.08.2009  [2009/34]
03.07.2009 Change - inventor published on  05.08.2009  [2009/32]
23.06.2009 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
23.06.2009 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
01.05.2009 Change - inventor published on  03.06.2009  [2009/23]
22.04.2009 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
20.03.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.04.2009  [2009/17]