blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2051303
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009001491Global Dossier 01.01.2009A1
Priority number Date
US89580007 28.08.2007
US85516206 30.10.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2051303Global Dossier 05.07.2017B1
EP2051303 17.12.2014A3
EP2051303 22.04.2009A2
Priority number Date
US89580007 28.08.2007