Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2051303

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 05.07.2017
 BELapse: 31.07.2017
 BGLapse: 05.10.2017
 CHLapse: 31.07.2017
CY 
 CZLapse: 05.07.2017
 DE 
 DKLapse: 05.07.2017
 EELapse: 05.07.2017
 ESLapse: 05.07.2017
 FILapse: 05.07.2017
 FR 
 GBLapse: 05.10.2017
 GRLapse: 06.10.2017
 HRLapse: 05.07.2017
 HU 
 IELapse: 24.07.2017
 ISLapse: 05.11.2017
 ITLapse: 05.07.2017
 LILapse: 31.07.2017
 LTLapse: 05.07.2017
 LULapse: 24.07.2017
LVLapse: 05.07.2017
 MCLapse: 05.07.2017
MTLapse: 24.07.2017
 NL 
 NOLapse: 05.10.2017
 PLLapse: 05.07.2017
 PT 
 ROLapse: 05.07.2017
 SELapse: 05.07.2017
 SILapse: 05.07.2017
 SKLapse: 05.07.2017
 TR 
Examination procedure18.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
15.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
07.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201003   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2011
31.07.201306   M06   Fee paid on   01.10.2013
31.07.201407   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2014
European patent granted05.07.2017
Opposition procedure06.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit published on 13.06.2018 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.04.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:22.04.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:03.06.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:GILLE, CHRISTOPH
 
Event date:03.06.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:HOLMES, CHRIS
 
Event date:03.06.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:ISRAELOWITZ, MEIR
 
Event date:03.06.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:RIZVI, SYED W. H.
 
Event date:03.06.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:VON SCHROEDER, HERBERT P
 
Event date:05.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:GILLE, CHRISTOPH
 
Event date:05.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:HOLMES, CHRIS
 
Event date:05.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:ISRAELOWITZ, MEIR
 
Event date:05.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:RIZVI, SYED W. H.
 
Event date:05.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:P.VON SCHROEDER, HERBERT
 
Event date:19.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:GILLE, CHRISTOPH
 
Event date:19.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:HOLM, CHRIS
 
Event date:19.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:ISRAELOWITZ, MEIR
 
Event date:19.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:RIZVI, SYED W. H.
 
Event date:19.08.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:P.VON SCHROEDER, HERBERT
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:GILLE, CHRISTOPH
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:HOLMES, CHRIS
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:ISRAELOWITZ, MEIR
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:RIZVI, SYED W. H.
 
Event date:02.09.2009 
Event description:INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT
Inventor Name:P.VON SCHROEDER, HERBERT
 
Event date:10.12.2014 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/00 20060101ALI20141104BHEP
 
Event date:10.12.2014 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 31/0203 20140101AFI20141104BHEP
 
Event date:10.12.2014 
Event description:CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01L 31/0352 20060101ALI20141104BHEP
 
Event date:17.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:17.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20150512
 
Event date:26.08.2015 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:BA
 
Event date:26.08.2015 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:AL
 
Event date:26.08.2015 
Event description:PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.08.2015 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:MK
 
Event date:26.08.2015 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:RS
 
Event date:03.05.2017 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20170405
 
Event date:05.07.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:05.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:13.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:14.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:15.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 907135 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20170715
 
Event date:26.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:17.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602008050934 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:20.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170731
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170713
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170811
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:15.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 907135 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:27.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171005
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171105
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171006
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20171005
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:06.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602008050934 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:18.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170724
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170731
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170731
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:04.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170731
 
Event date:13.06.2018 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20180406
 
Event date:27.06.2018 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20171005
 
Event date:29.06.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170724
 
Event date:23.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20171005
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170705
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170731
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170724