Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020593

EP2020593 - Scale [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.03.2017  [2017/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leifheit AG
Leifheitstrasse 1
56377 Nassau/Lahn / DE
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Gross, Christian
Habachstrasse 6
57250 Netphen / DE
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Bungartz, Klaus Peter , et al
Bungartz Christophersen
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/21]Bungartz, Klaus Peter , et al
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
Former [2009/06]Ullrich & Naumann
Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Luisenstrasse 14
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date08013322.624.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateDE2007103575327.07.2007         Original published format: DE102007035753
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020593
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01G23/37, G01G19/415, G01G19/44
[2016/20]
Former International [2009/06]G01G19/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Waage[2009/06]
English:Scale[2009/06]
French:Balance[2009/06]
Examination procedure04.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
06.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/12]
02.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/12]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
15.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201104   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2011
31.07.201609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO03019487  (BURKE MARK ANTHONY [IE]) [X] 1-11,13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0024] - [0026] * * figure 2 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]US2007167286  (ROES MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10,13,14 * page 3, line 3 - line 5 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-15