Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026183

EP2026183 - Information processing device and program for displaying and manipulating windows [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]Information processing device and program
[2010/42]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DOCOMO, INC.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kano, Izua
c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
02 / Yamada, Eiju
c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
03 / Murakami, Keiichi
c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
04 / Onda, Yasushi
c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
05 / Yamada, Kazuhiro
c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
06 / Kamiya, Dai
c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-6150 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013344.024.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateJP2007019240724.07.2007         Original published format: JP 2007192407
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026183
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026183
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/048
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2013/37]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Programm zur Darstellung und Bearbeitung von Fenstern[2010/42]
English:Information processing device and program for displaying and manipulating windows[2010/42]
French:Dispositif de traitement d'informations et programme pour afficher et manipuler des fenêtres[2010/42]
Former [2009/08]Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Programm
Former [2009/08]Information processing device and program
Former [2009/08]Dispositif de traitement d'informations et programme
Examination procedure24.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
21.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/46]
09.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2004094423  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [YD] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [Y]  COHEN E S ET AL, "Automatic strategies in the Siemens RTL tiled window manager", COMPUTER WORKSTATIONS, 1988., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND IEEE CONFERENCE O N SANTA CLARA, CA, USA 7-10 MARCH 1988, WASHINGTON, DC, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC. PR, US, (19880307), doi:10.1109/COMWOR.1988.4808, ISBN 978-0-8186-0810-0, pages 111 - 119, XP010011385 [Y] 1-5 * page 115 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMWOR.1988.4808
by applicantJP2004094423