Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020457

EP2020457 - Method and facility for continuous treatment of strips of textile goods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2010
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.05.2010  [2010/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Strahm Hi-Tex Systems AG
Kreuzlinger Strasse 5
8574 Lengwil-Oberhofen / CH
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Niklaus, Michael
Schaffhauserstrasse 56
8472 Seuzach / DE
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Gachnang, Hans Rudolf
Gachnang AG Patentanwälte
Badstrasse 5
Postfach
8501 Frauenfeld 1 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Gachnang, Hans Rudolf
Patentanwalt H.R. Gachnang Badstrasse 5 Postfach
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
Former [2009/06]Secklehner, Günter
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
Application number, filing date08013413.325.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateCH2007000121328.07.2007         Original published format: CH 12132007
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020457
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020457
Date:15.04.2009
[2009/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:D06C15/02, D06C7/00, F26B13/08, F26B13/10
[2009/16]
Former International [2009/06]D06C15/02, D06C7/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/52]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anlage zum kontinuierlichen Behandeln von textilen Warenbahnen[2009/06]
English:Method and facility for continuous treatment of strips of textile goods[2009/06]
French:Procédé et installation destinés au traitement continu de bandes de marchandise textiles[2009/06]
Examination procedure23.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/21]
30.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/21]
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2700226  (JULIEN DUNGLER) [Y] 4-12 * figures 3-5; claim 1 * * the whole document * [A] 1-12;
 [Y]JPH10300343  (HIRANO KINZOKU CO LTD) [Y] 4-12 * paragraph [0033]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO2006015508  (STRAHM TEXTILE SYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB416540  (KARL FRITZ TANDEL) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]FR2595379  (HELIOT ETS MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4610617  (CHRIST ALFRED [CH], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3533273  (RUCKH GERHARD MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005003661  (STRAHM TEXTILE SYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH07126980  (HIRANO KINZOKU CO LTD) [A] 4-12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] - [0022] , [0023] , [0033] - [0037] - [0050] - [0052] *;
 [A]US3739490  (COMSTOCK G) [A] 4-12 * the whole document *