Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2128970

EP2128970 - Power supplying device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.07.2017  [2017/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lite-On Technology Corporation
22F., No. 392, Ruey Kuang Road Neihu, Taipei 11492
Taiwan / TW
[2009/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Hsiao, Yi-Chou
Lite-ON Technology Corp. 22F., No. 392, Ruey Kuang Road
Neihu, Taipei 11492 / TW
02 / Chen, Wen-Sheng
Lite-ON Technology Corp. 22F., No. 392, Ruey Kuang Road
Neihu, Taipei 11492 / TW
 [2009/49]
Representative(s)Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013555.128.07.2008
[2009/49]
Priority number, dateTW2008010056107.01.2008         Original published format: TW 97100561
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2128970
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2128970
Date:22.09.2010
[2010/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/335
[2009/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:Stromversorgungsvorrichtung[2009/49]
English:Power supplying device[2009/49]
French:Dispositif d'alimentation[2009/49]
Examination procedure17.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
01.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/28]
28.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/28]
Divisional application(s)EP11158184.9  / EP2333945
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2000354374  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5008794  (LEMAN BROOKS R [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 25 - line 28 * * column 4, line 49 - line 50 *;
 [I]US2003141855  (KANEHIRA HIROKI [JP], et al) [I] 11,12 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]DE3843183  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, lines 48-53 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 6 * * figure 1 *