Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026644

EP2026644 - Carrier belt for carrying electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH
August-Häusser-Strasse 10
74080 Heilbronn / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Kuntz, Julio
Brunnensteige 14
74861 Neudenau / DE
02 / Brückmann, Eckhard
Keltergasse 40
74193 Stetten / DE
 [2009/08]
Application number, filing date08013591.629.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103750608.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007037506
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026644
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026644
Date:25.02.2009
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026644
Date:03.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H05K13/02
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesAL25.08.2009
BA25.08.2009
MK25.08.2009
RS25.08.2009
TitleGerman:Trägerband zur Aufnahme elektronischer Bauteile[2009/08]
English:Carrier belt for carrying electronic components[2009/08]
French:Bande de support destinée à la réception de composants électroniques[2009/08]
Examination procedure25.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
28.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2010Fee for grant paid
23.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
HU03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
LU29.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
LU29.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2013/26]CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
LU29.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2013/25]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
LU29.07.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/21]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
BE31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/12]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2012/05]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
MT03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2012/03]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/38]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/36]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/35]CZ03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/34]FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
ES14.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/29]FI03.11.2010
HR03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
LV03.11.2010
NL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
NO03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4428761  (OSTERRATH GMBH & CO METALLWARE [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3434717  (OKUITOKU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4583641  (GELZER JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantGB1289840
 DE3327612
 US4583641
 JPH0329762