Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020756

EP2020756 - Multiple branch primary synchronisation detection module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
5300 California Avenue
Irvine, CA 92617 / US
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Hahm, Mark
190 Granary Circle
53029 Hartland, WI / US
02 / Chang, Li Fung
11 Burgundy Drive
07733 Holmdel, NJ / US
03 / Conroy, Johannes Hendrik
10656 Rancho Carmel Drive
92128 San Diego, CA / US
04 / Luo, Wei
24 Osprey Court
07746 Marlbor, NJ / US
05 / Sollenberger, Nelson
193 Cranberry Road
07727 Farmingdale, NJ / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Jehle, Volker Armin , et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013681.530.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateUS20070953280P01.08.2007         Original published format: US 953280 P
US2007085282810.09.2007         Original published format: US 852828
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020756
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020756
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020756
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/7075
[2015/32]
Former International [2013/32]H04B1/707, H04J11/00
Former International [2009/06]H04B1/707
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2014/12]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modul zur Primärsynchronisierungsdetektion mit mehreren Verzweigungen[2009/06]
English:Multiple branch primary synchronisation detection module[2009/06]
French:Module de détection de synchronisation primaire à plusieurs branches[2009/06]
Examination procedure07.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/12]
23.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2015Fee for grant paid
05.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2015
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB30.07.2016
[2017/36]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007083912  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 28 - page 15, line 20 * * figures 11,13,15,16 *;
 [A]US2003043768  (CHANG LI FUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 5,12 *