Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023607

EP2023607 - Vehicle camera system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.05.2017
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Hitachi Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayakawa, Jun c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group
12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Ohsumi, Ken c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group
12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building
6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
 [2009/15]
Former [2009/07]01 / Hayakawa, Jun c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group
12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg.
6-1-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Ohsumi, Ken c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group
12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg.
6-1-1 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/23]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/07]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013753.231.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateJP2007020580507.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007205805
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023607
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023607
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2016/28]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugkamerasystem[2009/07]
English:Vehicle camera system[2009/07]
French:Système de caméra pour un véhicule[2010/42]
Former [2009/07]Système de caméra d'un véhicule
Examination procedure01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.05.2016Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.06.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
10.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2002300441  (MINOLTA CO LTD) [I] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *
by applicantJP2006033254