blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2026398

EP2026398 - Fuel cell system and method for operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.10.2012  [2012/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Wake, Chihiro
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
02 / Miyata, Koichiro
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
 [2011/43]
Former [2009/08]01 / Wake, Chihiro
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
02 / Miyata, Koichiro
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP
Representative(s)Prechtel, Jörg, et al
C/o Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Richard-Strauss-Straße 80
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Prechtel, Jörg, et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013785.431.07.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateJP2007020285303.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007202853
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026398
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026398
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationIPC:H01M8/04
[2009/08]
CPC:
H01M8/04179 (EP,US); H01M8/04231 (EP,US); H01M8/04253 (EP,US);
H01M8/04462 (EP,US); H01M8/04753 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Brennstoffzellensystem und Betriebsverfahren dafür[2009/08]
English:Fuel cell system and method for operating the same[2009/08]
French:Système de pile à combustible et son procédé de fonctionnement[2009/08]
Examination procedure31.07.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
03.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2011Fee for grant paid
02.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2009
Opposition(s)27.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2003331893  (NISSAN MOTOR) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2006185904  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-13* abstract *;
 [Y]US2007059569  (MATSUMOTO YUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0008] , [0028] - [0041] *
by applicantJP2003331893
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.