Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020639

EP2020639 - Measurement results managing method, system, and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSMEX CORPORATION
5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Nakahira, Masunao
Sysmex corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigondori 1-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
02 / Kawamura, Yoshiyuki
Sysmex corporation 5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigondori 1-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013857.101.08.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateJP2007020243003.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007202430
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020639
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, System und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung von Messergebnissen[2009/06]
English:Measurement results managing method, system, and apparatus[2009/06]
French:Procédé, système et appareil de gestion des résultats de mesure[2009/06]
Examination procedure28.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
03.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/32]
27.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
by applicantUS2005102166
 US2005131734
 JP2002007565