Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026050

EP2026050 - Imaging spectrometer comprising a device for separating at least two light beams, each representing an area [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]Device for separating at least two light beams, each representing an area, and spectrometer with such a device, in particular for imaging spectroscopy
[2010/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erwin Kayser-Threde GmbH
Wolfratshauser Strasse 48
81379 München / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schubert, Josef
Mühlenstrasse 30a
85737 Ismaning / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date08013866.201.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103606701.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007036067
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026050
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026050
Date:21.07.2010
Language:DE
[2010/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/04, G02B27/10, G02B27/14
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Abbildendes Spektrometer mit einer Vorrichtung zur Trennung wenigstens zweier jeweils einen örtlichen Bereich abbildender Lichtbündel[2010/08]
English:Imaging spectrometer comprising a device for separating at least two light beams, each representing an area[2010/08]
French:Spectromètre d'imagérie comprennant un dispositif de séparation d'au moins deux faisceaux lumineux représentant respectivement une zone spatiale[2010/08]
Former [2009/08]Vorrichtung zur Trennung wenigstens zweier jeweils einen örtlichen Bereich abbildender Lichtbündel und Spektrometer mit einer solchen Vorrichtung, insbesondere für die abbildende Spektroskopie
Former [2009/08]Device for separating at least two light beams, each representing an area, and spectrometer with such a device, in particular for imaging spectroscopy
Former [2009/08]Dispositif de séparation d'au moins deux faisceaux lumineux représentant respectivement une zone spatiale et spectromètre doté d'un tel dispositif, en particulier pour la spectroscopie représentative
Examination procedure07.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
08.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2010Fee for grant paid
10.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3932886  (KNAPP GUENTER [AT], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 3, line 34 - line 51; figure 1 * * column 4, line 37 - line 63 *;
 [A]WO9407117  (GEOPHYSICAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL [US]) [A] 11-13 * abstract *;
 [A]DE899282  (LEITZ ERNST GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0418705  (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 2-6 * abstract *