Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027959

EP2027959 - Apparatus for trimming window fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rotox Besitz- und Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH
In der Flachsau 10
65611 Brechen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
ROTOX Besitz- und Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH
In der Flachsau 10
65611 Brechen / DE
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
ROTOX GmbH B. EISENBACH
In der Flachsau 10
65611 Brechen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eisenbach, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Auf dem Umgang 12
65611 Brechen / DE
02 / Barthel, Thomas
Dresdener Strasse 7f
65549 Limburg / DE
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Weilnau, Carsten
Dr. Müller + Partner
Patentanwälte
Mühlstrasse 9a
65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Weilnau, Carsten
Dr. Müller + Partner Patentanwälte Mühlstrasse 9a
D-65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE
Application number, filing date08014039.506.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateDE2007104028124.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007040281
[2009/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027959
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:B23D33/10
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Ablänger von Fensterbeschlagteilen[2009/09]
English:Apparatus for trimming window fittings[2009/09]
French:Dispositif destiné à sectionner des ferrures de fenêtres[2009/09]
Examination procedure25.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
31.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/32]
27.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19521368  (FEDERHENN MASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column 1, line 14 - line 24 * * column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 27 - line 41; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE3437092  (FEDERHENN HARTMUT) [Y] 1-10 * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 30; figure - *;
 [Y]EP1495832  (SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0024]; figure - * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]DE19933890  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]);
 [A]EP0450363  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]);
 [DA]DE102005044938  (SIEGENIA AUBI KG [DE])
by applicantDE102005044938