Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026632

EP2026632 - Method for determining core temperature of cooked food and cooking device to perform this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rational AG
Iglinger Strasse 62
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schreiner, Thomas
Starenweg 4
86916 Kaufering / DE
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Weber-Bruls, Dorothée , et al
Jones Day
Nextower
Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2017/04]
Former [2009/43]Weber-Bruls, Dorothée , et al
Jones Day Hochhaus am Park Grüneburgweg 102
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2009/08]Weber-Bruls, Dorothée
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08014186.408.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateDE2007103902717.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007039027
[2009/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026632
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026632
Date:15.12.2010
[2010/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026632
Date:25.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/68, F24C7/08, G01K1/00
[2010/50]
Former International [2009/08]H05B6/68
Designated contracting statesCZ,   DE,   DK,   FR,   IT [2017/04]
Former [2011/34]CZ,  DE,  DK,  FR,  IT 
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Kerntemperatur eines Garguts und Gargerät zur Durchführung solch eines Verfahrens[2009/08]
English:Method for determining core temperature of cooked food and cooking device to perform this method[2009/08]
French:Procédé de détermination de la température de noyau d'un article de cuisson et appareil de cuisson destiné à l'exécution d'un tel procédé[2009/08]
Examination procedure15.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
16.06.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.07.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
10.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2016Fee for grant paid
13.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2012
Opposition(s)26.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
30.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ25.01.2017
DK25.01.2017
IT25.01.2017
FR31.08.2017
[2018/40]
Former [2017/51]CZ25.01.2017
DK25.01.2017
IT25.01.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ25.01.2017
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2098788  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [E] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2006112833  (BLASCHKE GUNTER [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1253382  (RATIONAL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6753027  (GREINER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19718399  (RATIONAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9316333  (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1757862  (ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL SPA [IT]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE20321133U  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE10109246  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0874198  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2244132  (LIQUID CRYSTAL DEVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1793173  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2004106899  (JACKMAN NICHOLAS [IE], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE10306940  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1271061  (ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL SPA [IT]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE29923215U  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP2163823  (TOPINOX SARL [FR]) [E] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP1927810  (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [PX] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP2078899  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [E] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE102006048753  (ELMKO GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE202005017251U  (SINNOTEC ENTWICKLUNGSGESELLSCH [DE]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0247522  (RATIONAL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO0223093  (ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [E]EP2026632  (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [E] 1-32 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0687866
 WO9848679
 EP0601137
 DE19945021
 DE10323651
 DE19609116
 DE10120136
 DE4216718
 WO2004062372
 WO2006069563
    - "Automatisierung des Garprozesses von Fleisch", TU DRESDEN, (1987), pages 55 - 60,
    - NORBERT ELSNER ET AL., Grundlagen der technischen Thermodynamik, AKADEMIEVERLAG GMBH, vol. 2, pages 83 - 94,
    - GÜNTHER MAIER; ERICH SCHIFFNER, technische Thermodynamik, pages 294 - 302,