Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2011886

EP2011886 - Compositions and methods for the diagnosis and treatment of tumor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94127 / US
[2009/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Frantz, Gretchen
2819 Buchanan Street
San Francisco, CA 94123 / US
02 / Polakis, Paul
1449 Cortez Avenue
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
03 / Spencer, Susan D.
2395 Paradise Drive
Tiburon, CA 94920 / US
04 / Wu, Thomas D.
113 Elise Street
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
05 / Zhang, Zemin
876 Taurus Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
 [2009/10]
Former [2009/02]01 / Frantz, Gretchen
135 San Benito Way
San Francisco, CA 94127 / US
02 / Polakis, Paul
1449 Cortez Avenue
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
03 / Spencer, Susan D.
2395 Paradise Drive
Tiburon, CA 94920 / US
04 / Wu, Thomas D.
113 Elise Street
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
05 / Zhang, Zemin
876 Taurus Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
Representative(s)Sampson, Catherine , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
York House
23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/02]Sampson, Catherine , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date08014348.010.04.2003
[2009/02]
Priority number, dateUS20020373160P16.04.2002         Original published format: US 373160 P
US20020378885P08.05.2002         Original published format: US 378885 P
US20020404809P19.08.2002         Original published format: US 404809 P
[2009/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2011886
Date:07.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2011886
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N15/09, C07K16/18, C07K16/30
[2009/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/02]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Behandlung und Diagnose von Tumoren[2009/02]
English:Compositions and methods for the diagnosis and treatment of tumor[2009/02]
French:Compositions et procédés pour le traitement et le diagnostic d'une tumeur[2009/02]
Examination procedure29.08.2008Examination requested  [2009/02]
12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/05]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/05]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03723980.3  / EP1571968
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0073348  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0026360  (ADHEREX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - ONO KENJI ET AL, "Identification by cDNA microarray of genes involved in ovarian carcinogenesis", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD.; US, (20000915), vol. 60, no. 18, pages 5007 - 5011, XP002314754 [Y] 5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "Gene Expression Omnibus - Platform GPL 96", DATABASE GEO, (20020311), Database accession no. GPL96, URL: NCBI, XP002506341 [Y] 5 * page 1 *
 [A]  - ROSS D T ET AL, "SYSTEMATIC VARIATION IN GENE EXPRESSION PATTERNS IN HUMAN CANCER CELL CEL LINES", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, US, (20000301), vol. 24, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 227 - 235, XP002933374 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/73432
by applicantUS4275149
 US4816567
 US5641870
 EP0404097
 WO9311161
 US5556762
 US5750373
 US4708871
 US4833092
 US5223409
 US5403484
 US5571689
 US5663143
 WO8403506
 WO8403564
 WO0000823
 WO0039585
 US5500362
 US5821337
 WO9845479
 US4933294
 WO9105264
 US5401638
 US5545806
 US5569825
 US5591669
 US5545807
 WO9717852
 US5565332
 US5573905
 US5567610
 US5229275
 US5869046
 WO9316185
 US5571894
 US5587458
 WO9616673
 US5837234
 WO9802463
 WO9308829
 WO9404690
 US5731168
 US4676980
 WO9100360
 WO9220373
 EP0308936
 US5739277
 WO9411026
 US3896111
 US4151042
 US4137230
 US4248870
 US4256746
 US4260608
 US4265814
 US4294757
 US4307016
 US4308268
 US4308269
 US4309428
 US4313946
 US4315929
 US4317821
 US4322348
 US4331598
 US4361650
 US4364866
 US4424219
 US4450254
 US4362663
 US4371533
 US5208020
 US5416064
 EP0425235
 US5712374
 US5714586
 US5739116
 US5767285
 US5770701
 US5770710
 US5773001
 US5877296
 US5053394
 WO9321232
 US4485045
 US4544545
 WO9738731
 US5013556
 WO9534683
 US5627024
 US5766905
 WO9814277
 WO9820169
 WO9820159
 WO9820036
 WO9735196
 WO9746251
 WO9747314
 WO9709446
 US5498538
 US5432018
 WO9815833
 US5723286
 US5580717
 US5427908
 US5498530
 US5770434
 US5734018
 US5698426
 US5763192
 US5723323
 WO8101145
 WO8807378
 US4975278
 US5364934
 WO8705330
 US4640835
 US4496689
 US4301144
 US4670417
 US4791192
 US4179337
 US5428130
 WO8905859
 US4399216
 DD266710
 US4946783
 US5648237
 US5789199
 US5840523
 EP0139383
 US4943529
 EP0402226
 EP0183070
 EP0244234
 EP0394538
 WO9100357
 US5010182
 EP0362179
 WO9013646
 EP0036776
 EP0073657
 GB2211504
 EP0117060
 EP0117058
 US4767704
 US4657866
 US4927762
 US4560655
 US5122469
 WO9003430
 WO8700195
 USRE30985E
 US3773919
 EP0600517
 EP0616812
 WO9607321
 US4892538
 US5283187
 WO9325673
 WO9106629
 US3687808
 US4469863
 US4476301
 US5023243
 US5177196
 US5188897
 US5264423
 US5276019
 US5278302
 US5286717
 US5321131
 US5399676
 US5405939
 US5453496
 US5455233
 US5466677
 US5476925
 US5519126
 US5536821
 US5541306
 US5550111
 US5563253
 US5571799
 US5587361
 US5194599
 US5565555
 US5527899
 US5721218
 US5672697
 US5625050
 US5034506
 US5166315
 US5185444
 US5214134
 US5216141
 US5235033
 US5264562
 US5264564
 US5405938
 US5434257
 US5470967
 US5489677
 US5541307
 US5561225
 US5596086
 US5602240
 US5610289
 US5608046
 US5618704
 US5623070
 US5663312
 US5633360
 US5677437
 US5792608
 US5646269
 US5677439
 US5539082
 US5714331
 US5719262
 WO9839352
 WO9914226
 US4981957
 US5118800
 US5319080
 US5359044
 US5393878
 US5446137
 US5466786
 US5514785
 US5519134
 US5567811
 US5576427
 US5591722
 US5597909
 US5610300
 US5627053
 US5639873
 US5646265
 US5658873
 US5670633
 US5792747
 US5700920
 US4845205
 US5130302
 US5134066
 US5175273
 US5367066
 US5432272
 US5457187
 US5459255
 US5484908
 US5502177
 US5525711
 US5552540
 US5587469
 US5594121
 US5596091
 US5614617
 US5645985
 US5830653
 US5763588
 US6005096
 US5681941
 US5750692
 US6656730
 US4828979
 US4948882
 US5218105
 US5525465
 US5541313
 US5545730
 US5552538
 US5578717
 US5580731
 US5591584
 US5109124
 US5118802
 US5138045
 US5414077
 US5486603
 US5512439
 US5578718
 US4587044
 US4605735
 US4667025
 US4762779
 US4789737
 US4824941
 US4835263
 US4876335
 US4904582
 US4958013
 US5082830
 US5112963
 US5214136
 US5245022
 US5254469
 US5258506
 US5262536
 US5272250
 US5292873
 US5317098
 US5371241
 US5391723
 US5416203
 US5451463
 US5510475
 US5512667
 US5565552
 US5567810
 US5574142
 US5585481
 US5587371
 US5595726
 US5597696
 US5599923
 US5599928
 US5688941
 US5013830
 US5149797
 US5220007
 US5256775
 US5366878
 US5403711
 US5491133
 US5565350
 US5623065
 US5652355
 US5652356
 US5700922
 US5108921
 US5354844
 US5416016
 US5459127
 US5521291
 US5543158
 US5547932
 US5583020
 US5591721
 US4426330
 US4534899
 US5213804
 US5227170
 US5264221
 US5356633
 US5395619
 US5417978
 US5462854
 US5469854
 US5512295
 US5527528
 US5534259
 US5543152
 US5556948
 US5580575
 US5595756
 WO9010048
 WO9013641
 WO9104753
 WO9010448
 US4736866
 US4870009
 WO9733551
 EP0307247
    - BORING ET AL., CA CANCEL J. CLIN., (1993), vol. 43, page 7,
    - NIELSEN ET AL., PROTO ENG., (1997), vol. 10, pages 1 - 6,
    - HEINJE ET AL., NUCL. ! ACIDS. RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 4683 - 4690,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS, (1989),
    - KABAT ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, (1991),
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917,
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495,
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628,
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597,
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855,
    - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENS., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062,
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315,
    - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448,
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525,
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329,
    - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596,
    - GEYSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 81, pages 3998 - 4002,
    - GEYSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1985), vol. 82, pages 178 - 182,
    - GEYSEN ET AL., SYNTHETIC PEPTIDES AS ANTIGENS, (1986), pages 130 - 149,
    - GEYSEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1987), vol. 102, pages 259 - 274,
    - SCHOOFS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 140, pages 611 - 616,
    - CWIRLA, S. E. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 6378,
    - LOWMAN, H.B. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, page 10832,
    - CLACKSON, T. ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, page 624,
    - MARKS, J. D. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581,
    - KANG, A.S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 8363,
    - SMITH, G. P., CURRENT OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 2, page 668,
    - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92,
    - CLYNES ET AL., USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656,
    - M. IN DAERON, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 203 - 234,
    - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 492,
    - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34,
    - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 41,
    - GUYER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, page 587,
    - KIM ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 249,
    - GAZZANO-SANTORO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 202, page 163,
    - MOORE ET AL., CYTOTECHNOLOGV, (1995), vol. 17, pages 1 - 11,
    - SIAS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1990), vol. 132, pages 73 - 80,
    - "Cell cycle regulation, oncogenes, and antineoplastic drugs", MURAKAMI ET AL., The Molecular Basis of Cancer, WB SAUNDERS, (1995), page 13,
    - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103,
    - KOZBOR, J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001,
    - BRODEUR ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1987), pages 51 - 63,
    - MUNSON ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 107, page 220,
    - SKERRA ET AL., CURR. OPINION IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, pages 256 - 262,
    - PLUCKTHUN, IMMUNOL. REVS., (1992), vol. 130, pages 151 - 188,
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554,
    - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOSV., (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783,
    - WATERHOUSE ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266,
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 6851,
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327,
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536,
    - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296,
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 901,
    - CARTER, RR C. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285,
    - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2623,
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551,
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258,
    - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33,
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553,
    - JOHNSON, KEVIN S.; CHISWELL, DAVID J., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 564 - 571,
    - GRIFFITH ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734,
    - MORIMOTO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117,
    - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81,
    - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167,
    - MILLSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539,
    - TRAUNECKER, EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659,
    - SURESH ET AL., METHODS IN ENZVMOLOGY, (1986), vol. 121, page 210,
    - SHALABY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1992), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225,
    - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553,
    - GRUBER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, page 5368,
    - TUTT ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, page 60,
    - CARON ET AL., J. EXP MED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1191 - 1195,
    - SHOPES, B., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2918 - 2922,
    - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565,
    - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 230,
    - VITETTA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, page 1098,
    - LIU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 8618 - 8623,
    - CHARI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131,
    - CARLSSON ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1978), vol. 173, pages 723 - 737,
    - HINMAN ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342,
    - LODE ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 58, pages 2925 - 2928,
    - FRAKER ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1978), vol. 80, pages 49 - 57,
    - CHATAL, Monoclonal Antibodies in Immunoscintigraphy, CRC PRESS, (1989),
    - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 3688,
    - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4030,
    - MARTIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, pages 286 - 288,
    - GABIZON ET AL., J. NATIONAL CANCER INST., (1989), vol. 81, no. 19, page 1484,
    - SCOTT, J.K.; SMITH, G. P., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, page 386,
    - REN ET AL., GENE, (1998), vol. 215, page 439,
    - ZHU ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 58, no. 15, pages 3209 - 3214,
    - JIANG ET AL., INFECTION & IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 4770 - 4777,
    - REN ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 195, no. 2, pages 303 - 311,
    - REN, PROTEIN SCI., (1996), vol. 5, page 1833,
    - EFIMOV ET AL., VIRUS GENES, (1995), vol. 10, page 173,
    - SMITH; SCOTT, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1993), vol. 217, pages 228 - 257,
    - LI ET AL., MOL BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 9, page 187,
    - MASSEY, NATURE, (1987), vol. 328, pages 457 - 458,
    - NEUBERGER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 312, pages 604 - 608,
    - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 13, page 4331,
    - ZOLLER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 10, page 6487,
    - WELLS ET AL., GENE, M, (1985), vol. 31,
    - WELLS ET AL., PHILOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LONDON SERA, (1986), vol. 317, page 415,
    - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085,
    - CREIGHTON, The Proteins, W.H. FREEMAN & CO.,
    - CHOTHIA, J. MOL. BIOL., (1976), vol. 150, page 1,
    - T.E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, W.H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86,
    - APLIN; WRISTON, CRC CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), pages 259 - 306,
    - HAKIMUDDIN ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1987), vol. 259, page 52,
    - EDGE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 118, page 131,
    - THOTAKURA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 350,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (1980),
    - FIELD ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 2159 - 2165,
    - EVAN ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 5, pages 3610 - 3616,
    - PABORSKY ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1990), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 547 - 553,
    - HOPP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 2, pages 1204 - 1210,
    - MARTIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 192 - 194,
    - SKINNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 15163 - 15166,
    - LUTZ-FREYERMUTH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6393 - 6397,
    - STEWART ET AL., Solid-Phase Peptide Synthesis, W.H. FREEMAN CO., (1969),
    - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989),
    - DIEFFENBACH ET AL., PCR Primer: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1995),
    - Mammalian Cell Biotechnology: a Practical Approach, IRL PRESS, (1991),
    - SHAW ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 23, page 315,
    - GRAHAM; VAN DER EB, VIROLOGY, (1978), vol. 52, pages 456 - 457,
    - VAN SOLINGEN ET AL., J. BACT., (1977), vol. 130, page 946,
    - HSIAO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 3829,
    - KEOWN ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), vol. 185, pages 527 - 537,
    - MANSOUR ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 336, pages 348 - 352,
    - BEACH; NURSE, NATURE, (1981), vol. 290, page 140,
    - FLEER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 968 - 975,
    - LOUVENCOURT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 154, no. 2, pages 737 - 742,
    - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 135,
    - SREEKRISHNA ET AL., J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 28, pages 265 - 278,
    - CASE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 5259 - 5263,
    - BALLANCE ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1983), vol. 112, pages 284 - 289,
    - TILBURN ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 26, pages 205 - 221,
    - YELTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474,
    - KELLY; HYNES, EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 475 - 479,
    - C. ANTHONY, THE BIOCHEMISTRY OF METHVLOTROPHS, (1982), vol. 269,
    - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59,
    - CHO, URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216,
    - MATHER, BIOI. REDROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251,
    - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68,
    - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216,
    - STINCHCOMB ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 282, page 39,
    - KINGSMAN ET AL., GENE, (1979), vol. 7, page 141,
    - TSCHEMPER ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 10, page 157,
    - JONES, GENETICS, (1977), vol. 85, page 12,
    - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1978), vol. 275, page 615,
    - GOEDDEL ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, page 544,
    - GOEDDEL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057,
    - DEBOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25,
    - HITZEMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 2073,
    - HESS ET AL., J. ADV. ENZYME REG., (1968), vol. 7, page 149,
    - HOLLAND, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1978), vol. 17, page 4900,
    - GETHING ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 293, pages 620 - 625,
    - MANTEI ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, pages 40 - 46,
    - HAM ET AL., METH. ENZ., (1979), vol. 58, page 44,
    - BAMES ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 102, page 255,
    - THOM&OC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 5201 - 5205,
    - DEUTSCHER, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), vol. 182,
    - SCOPES, Protein Purification: Principles and Practice, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1982),
    - LINDMARK ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1983), vol. 62, pages 1 - 13,
    - GUSS ET AL., EMBO J., (1986), vol. 5, pages 1567 - 1575,
    - Chemotherapy Service, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, (1992),
    - ANDERSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813,
    - NIELSEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500,
    - MARTIN ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504,
    - The Concise Encyclopedia Of Polymer Science And Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1990), pages 858 - 859,
    - ENGLISCH ET AL., Angewandte Chemie, (1991), vol. 30, page 613,
    - SANGHVI ET AL., Antisense Research and Applications, CRC PRESS, (1993), pages 276 - 278,
    - LETSINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556,
    - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1994), vol. 4, pages 1053 - 1060,
    - MANOHARAN ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1992), vol. 660, pages 306 - 309,
    - MANOHARAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 2770,
    - OBERHAUSER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 533 - 538,
    - SAISON-BEHMOARAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1118,
    - KABANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 259, pages 327 - 330,
    - SVINARCHUK ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (1993), vol. 75, pages 49 - 54,
    - MANOHARAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, pages 3651 - 3654,
    - SHEA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 3777 - 3783,
    - MANOHARAN ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, pages 969 - 973,
    - MISHRA ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1264, pages 229 - 237,
    - LI ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, page 915,
    - BRADLEY, Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells: A Practical Approach, IRL, (1987), pages 113 - 152,
    - ZAMECNIK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 4143 - 4146,
    - DZAU ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 205 - 210,
    - WU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432,
    - WAGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 3410 - 3414,
    - FIELDS; SONG, NATURE (LONDON), (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246,
    - CHIEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 9578 - 9582,
    - CHEVRAY; NATHANS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 89, pages 5789 - 5793,
    - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Immun., (1991), vol. 1,
    - LEE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1979), vol. 6, page 3073,
    - COONEY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 456,
    - DERVAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, page 1360,
    - ROSSI, CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 4, pages 469 - 471,
    - MARASCO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7889 - 7893,
    - LU; GILLETT, CELL VISION, (1994), vol. 1, pages 169 - 176,
    - BOLIVAR ET AL., GENE, (1977), vol. 2, page 95,
    - SOMPARYRAC ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1981), vol. 12, page 7575,
    - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols of Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1997),
    - LUCAS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1996), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 1774 - 1779,
    - O'REILLEY ET AL., Baculovirus expression vectors: A Laboratory Manual, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1994),
    - RUPERT ET AL., Nature, (1993), vol. 362, pages 175 - 179,