EP2028243 - Coating agent on an aqueous basis and its application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.S. Staedtler GmbH & Co. KG Moosäckerstrasse 3 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pabst, Gunther, Dr. Badstrasse 34 92318 Neumarkt i.d. OPf. / DE | 02 /
Joos, Anja An der Heide 2 92353 Postbauer-Heng / DE | [2009/09] | Application number, filing date | 08014402.5 | 13.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | DE20071039086 | 18.08.2007 Original published format: DE102007039086 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028243 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09D17/00 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
C09D5/06 (EP);
C09D17/001 (EP);
C09D5/028 (EP);
C09D5/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Title | German: | Beschichtungsmittel auf wässriger Basis, sowie dessen Verwendung | [2009/09] | English: | Coating agent on an aqueous basis and its application | [2009/09] | French: | Moyen de revêtement à base aqueuse et son utilisation | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2007141115 (DEGUSSA [DE]; WENNING ANDREAS [DE]; LOEST DIETMAR [DE] EVONIK DEGUSSA) [PX] 1-9 * examples 1-7; claims 1-27 *; | [X]WO2007039604 (AKZO NOBEL COATINGS INT BV [NL]; HENRY STEVEN [GB]; BROWN ROGER FRANCI) [X] 1-9 * examples 1,2; claims 1-14 *; | [X]WO2007039603 (AKZO NOBEL COATINGS INT BV [NL]; ROY JAMIE MACLIVER [NL]; VAN DEN HAAK) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-10; claims 1-11 *; | [X]DE102005023804 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * example 1; claims 1-18 *; | [X]DE102005019747 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-12; claims 1-15 *; | [X]WO2004096922 (BROCKHUES GMBH & CO KG [DE]; NUNGESS NIKOLAUS WOLFGANG [DE]; VOGLER ST) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-6; claims 1-27 *; | [X]US5994530 (POSEY-DOWTY JESSICA DEE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-15; claims 1-28 *; | [X]WO9961534 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]; ORTALANO DARREN MARK [US]; VISSING CHRISTOPHER) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-29; claims 1-39 *; | [X]DE19915153 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * examples 1-9; claims 1-12 * |