Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026185

EP2026185 - System and method for managing storage device capacity usage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.2013
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dell Products, L.P.
One Dell Way
Round Rock, TX 78682-2244 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Dawkins, William P.
2626 Geronimo Trail
Austin TX 78734 / US
02 / Arrington, Steve
15508 Fernhill Drive
Austin TX 78717 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2009/08]Wegner, Hans
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date08014501.414.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007083826714.08.2007         Original published format: US 838267
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026185
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026185
Date:25.03.2009
[2009/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026185
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32, G06F3/06
[2012/10]
Former International [2009/08]G06F3/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Verwaltung der Kapazitätsnutzung einer Speichervorrichtung[2009/08]
English:System and method for managing storage device capacity usage[2009/08]
French:Système et procédé de gestion de l'utilisation de capacité d'un dispositif de stockage[2009/08]
Examination procedure14.08.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
13.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2012Date of oral proceedings
24.02.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2012Fee for grant paid
18.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.05.2009
Opposition(s)10.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.08.2008
AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
MT08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
TR08.08.2012
IE14.08.2012
LU14.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
MT08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
TR08.08.2012
IE14.08.2012
LU14.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2014/21]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
MT08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
TR08.08.2012
IE14.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/51]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
MT08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
IE14.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/34]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
IE14.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
BG08.11.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/33]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
IE14.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
IT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
RO08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
SK08.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
CZ08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
EE08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
ES19.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
DK08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/20]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/16]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
MC31.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/15]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
NL08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
PT10.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT08.08.2012
BE08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SE08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
LV08.08.2012
PL08.08.2012
SI08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
GR09.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT08.08.2012
CY08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
HR08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
IS08.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT08.08.2012
FI08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
Former [2013/08]AT08.08.2012
LT08.08.2012
NO08.11.2012
Former [2013/07]AT08.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2005268121  (ROTHMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0020] - [0023] - [0025] , [0028] * * figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 9,10,14;
 [Y]US2005216665  (TAKAKUWA MASAYUKI [JP]) [Y] 9,10,14 * paragraphs [0048] , [0052] , [0057] , [0062] , [0066] * * figures 7A,7B,9A,9B,9C *;
 [A]US2006136684  (LE KIM B [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0049] , [0170] - [0172] - [0176] * * figure 1 *