Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2144175

EP2144175 - Method for performing a bulk load into a database [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.05.2018  [2018/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2010/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Andreas
Am Brunnberg 1
63762 Grossostheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
03 / Obmann, Wolfgang
Julius-Reiber-Strasse 18
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 [2012/25]
Former [2010/02]01 / Schmidt, Andreas
Am Brunnberg 1
63762 Grossostheim / DE
02 / Schönning, Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
03 / Obmann, Wolfgang
Julius-Reiber-Strasse 18
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2016/39]
Former [2010/02]Wegner, Hans , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date08014524.614.08.2008
[2010/02]
Priority number, dateEP2008001259011.07.2008         Original published format: EP 08012590
[2010/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2144175
Date:13.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2144175
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2010/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/39]
Former [2010/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Durchführung einer Massenspeicherung in eine Datenbank[2010/02]
English:Method for performing a bulk load into a database[2010/02]
French:Procédé pour effectuer un chargement volumineux dans une base de données[2010/02]
Examination procedure27.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/10]
22.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2016Fee for grant paid
18.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2010
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.12.2011Request for further processing filed
19.12.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.01.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
[2018/18]
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US7266539  (BERKS ROBERT T [NZ], et al) [A] * column 2, line 33 - column 4, line 45; figure 1 *;
 [X]  "Data Movement Utilities Guide and Reference Updated March, 2008 (excerpt)", IBM DB2 VERSION 9.5 FOR LINUX, UNIX, AND WINDOWS MANUAL, INTERNET, (200803), URL: ftp://ftp.software.ibm.com/ps/products/db2/info/vr95/pdf/en_US/db2dme951.pdf, (20081120), XP002504822 [X] 1-6 * Pages 1-6 and 125-179; *
 [L]  ANONYMOUS, "IBM DB2 VERSION 9.5 FOR LINUX, UNIX, AND WINDOWS ENGLISH MANUALS", IBM SOFTWARE DOCUMENTATION, INTERNET, (20081120), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www-01.ibm.com/support/docview.wss?rs=71&context=SSEPGG&context=SSEPDU&context=SSVGXH&context=SSVGZB&context=SSYK8P&context=SSTLZ9&dc=DA410&uid=swg27009727&loc=en_US&cs=utf-8&lang=en, (20081120), XP002504823 [L] * the whole document *
 [A]  CHAMBERLIN D, A complete guide to DB2 universal database, COMPLETE GUIDE TO DB2 UNIVERSAL DATABASE, EXCERPT: BNS PAGES 1-35, XP002239913 [A] 1-6 * page 649, paragraph 2 - page 652, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  SWONGER, R. F. ET AL, "Oracle Data Pump in Oracle Database 11g: Foundation for Ultra High-Speed Data Movement Utilities", AN ORACLE WHITE PAPER, INTERNET, (200707), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://www.oracle.com/technology/products/database/utilities/pdf/datapump11g2007_techover.pdf, (20081114), XP002504824 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  DURBIN J ET AL, "SQL*Loader Concepts", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://otn.oracle.co.kr/docs/oracle78/server.804/a58244/ch03.htm, (20040206), XP002269379 [A] * the whole document *
by applicantUS7266539