Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2144175


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
30.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2018  [2018/18]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
04.08.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
26.08.2016 (Expected) grant published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
25.08.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.08.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.05.2012 Change - inventor published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
29.12.2011 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
28.12.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.12.2011 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
28.12.2011 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
26.10.2011 Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
26.10.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.07.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.05.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.03.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.08.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.08.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  15.09.2010  [2010/37]
03.08.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.07.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.02.2010 First examination report
18.02.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.02.2010 Request for examination filed published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]
11.12.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.01.2010  [2010/02]
23.10.2009 Change - representative published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]