Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028207

EP2028207 - Resin composition for composite material parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.02.2010  [2010/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swancor Industrial Co., Ltd.
No. 9, Industry South 6 Road Nan Kang Industrial Park
540 Nan-Tou City / TW
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Tsai, Jau-Yang
No. 9, Industry South 6 Road Nan Kang Industrial Park
540 Nan-Tou City / TW
02 / Yur, Shih-Wen
No. 9, Industry South 6 Road Nan Kang Industrial Park
540 Nan-Tou City / TW
03 / Chen, Ching Yuan
No. 9, Industry South 6 Road Nan Kang Industrial Park
540 Nan-Tou City / TW
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08014539.414.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateTW2007013003414.08.2007         Original published format: TW 96130034
CN2007114623429.08.2007         Original published format: CN200710146234
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028207
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C08G59/00, C08L63/00
[2009/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Harzzusammensetzung für Verbundwerkstoffteile[2009/09]
English:Resin composition for composite material parts[2009/09]
French:Composition de résine pour pièces en matériau composite[2009/09]
Examination procedure26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/08]
08.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/08]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006251906  (LIAO WEN P [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * examples 3,11 *;
 [X]EP0339635  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-7 * table 1 *;
 [X]JPH0476019  ;
 [X]JPH11209723  ;
 [X]JP2004204047  ;
 [X]JPH01252627
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 16, Database accession no. 1992-129573, XP002503248 & JPH0476019 A 19920310 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 41, Database accession no. 1999-489020, XP002503249 & JPH11209723 A 19990803 (HITACHI CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 64, Database accession no. 2004-655558, XP002503250 & JP2004204047 A 20040722 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 46, Database accession no. 1989-337157, XP002503251 & JPH01252627 A 19891009 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract *