Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2157745

EP2157745 - Method for routing data traffic in an access node and access node [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2011
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.10.2011  [2011/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks OY
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2010/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidtke, Uwe
Margarethe-Lachmund-Strasse 34
17493 Greifswald / DE
 [2010/08]
Representative(s)Bruglachner, Thomas E.
Nokia Siemens Networks Oy
COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration
80240 Munich / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/08]Bruglachner, Thomas E.
Nokia Siemens Networks Oy COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration
80240 Munich / DE
Application number, filing date08014705.119.08.2008
[2010/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2157745
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2010/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Routen von Datenverkehr in einem Zugangsknoten und Zugangsknoten[2010/08]
English:Method for routing data traffic in an access node and access node[2010/08]
French:Procédé de routage de trafic de données dans un noeud d'accès et noeud d'accès[2010/08]
Examination procedure24.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
14.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/42]
31.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US6954463  (MA STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 3, line 15 - line 67 * * column 6, line 16 - column 14, line 11 * * figure 2.3.5.7 *;
 [X]US2006253606  (OKUNO MICHITAKA [JP]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0049] - [0072] * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2007097973  (SCUDDER JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0071] * * figure 1A *;
 [A]  FRANK EFFENBERGER ET AL, "An introduction to PON technologies [Topics in Optical Communications]", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20070301), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0163-6804, pages S17 - S25, XP011176589 [A] 1-16 * page S17 - page S20 *