Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2031472

EP2031472 - Device for operating a machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2009/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Bund, Gerhard
Talstrasse 102
97816 Lohr-Rodenbach / DE
 [2009/10]
Representative(s)Schuhbießer, Irmgard Gertrud , et al
Schuhbießer-Patent
Holzgartenstraße 6
93059 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Thürer, Andreas
Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1
97816 Lohr am Main / DE
Former [2009/10]Thürer, Andreas
Bosch Rexroth AG Intellectual Property Zum Eisengiesser 1
97816 Lohr am Main / DE
Application number, filing date08014835.621.08.2008
[2009/10]
Priority number, dateDE2007104136430.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007041364
DE2007104916213.10.2007         Original published format: DE102007049162
[2009/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2031472
Date:04.03.2009
Language:DE
[2009/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2031472
Date:02.12.2009
[2009/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2031472
Date:28.11.2012
Language:DE
[2012/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/414, B25J9/16
[2009/49]
Former International [2009/10]G05B19/414
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/10]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Betrieb einer Maschine[2009/10]
English:Device for operating a machine[2009/10]
French:Dispositif de fonctionnement d'une machine[2009/10]
Examination procedure02.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/28]
29.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2012Fee for grant paid
17.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.06.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.08.2013  30.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
FESTO AG & Co. KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB
Plochinger Straße 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
 [2015/11]
Former [2013/40]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2013   
FESTO AG & Co. KG
Ruiter Strasse 82
73734 Esslingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kocher, Mark Werner
Magenbauer & Kollegen Patentanwälte Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
04.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1339/15
31.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
28.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.08.2008
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IS28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
AT21.08.2013
GB21.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
LU21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
[2016/32]
Former [2015/34]HU21.08.2008
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
AT21.08.2013
GB21.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
LU21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
Former [2015/32]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
MT28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
AT21.08.2013
GB21.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
Former [2014/51]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
AT21.08.2013
GB21.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
Former [2014/37]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
GB21.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
FR02.09.2013
Former [2014/34]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
GB21.08.2013
IE21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/33]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
IE21.08.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/26]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
BE31.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2014/20]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
MC28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/37]CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
NL28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/34]DK28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/28]FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI28.11.2012
HR28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
LV28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI28.11.2012
LT28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT28.11.2012
NO28.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03081355  (QEM S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, line 7 - line 8; figure 2 * * page 2, line 21 - line 24 * * page 6, line 10 - line 20 * * page 10, line 10 - line 20 *;
 [X]EP1720083  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] - paragraph [0030] *;
 [X]US5493194  (DAMIANO MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 6 - line 18 * * column 2, line 33 - line 36 * * column 4, line 1 - line 45 *;
 [X]DE10145517  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026] *
by applicantWO03081355
 EP1720083
 DE19723956