Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1997376

EP1997376 - Herbicidal compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.11.2015
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.12.2015  [2015/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Ramachandran, Ravi
Syngenta Crop Protection Canada Inc. 140 Research Lane Guelph
Ontario N1G 4Z3 / CA
02 / Shulkin, Anna
Syngenta Crop Protection Canada, Inc. 140 Research Lane, Research Park University of GuelphGuelph
Ontario N1G 4Z3 / CA
 [2008/49]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
WRO B8-Z1-30
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Syngenta International AG
WRO 1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldalle 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2012/41]Hölscher, Ingo , et al
Syngenta International AG
Intellectual Property
WRO-1004-6-22
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2008/49]Hölscher, Ingo
Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date08015737.309.05.2006
[2008/49]
Priority number, dateUS20050679496P10.05.2005         Original published format: US 679496 P
[2008/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1997376
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/30, A01P13/00
[2008/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/49]
TitleGerman:Herbizidzusammensetzungen[2008/49]
English:Herbicidal compositions[2008/49]
French:Compositions herbicides[2008/49]
Examination procedure05.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
28.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/53]
13.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/53]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06744690.6  / EP1879452
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060744690) is  06.03.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
07.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03022049  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, paragraph 3; example 1 *;
 [X]US2003158044  (WOLLENWEBER HORST-WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * claim 1; table 1 *;
 [X]US6482772  (BRATZ MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9948359  (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9608150  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 5, paragraph 4; example 7 *;
 [X]US6218337  (BRATZ MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * claims 1,10,11 *;
 [DA]US5428000  (INNAMI HARUKI [JP], et al) [DA] * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4447257  (GERWICK III BEN C [US]) [DA] * the whole document *
by applicantUS4447257
 US5102442
 US5428000
 US6300323
    - The Pesticide Manual, BRITISH CROP PROTECTION COUNCIL