Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025584

EP2025584 - Frame for track apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2011
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATI, Inc.
204A Main Street
Mt. Vernon IN 47620 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Kahle, Glenn, W.
3293 Hwy 5
New Franklin, MO 65274 / US
02 / Juncker, Clarence, A.
3020 Black Ford Road
Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US
03 / Juncker, David, L.
5450 Red Lake Drive
Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US
04 / Juncker, Kenneth, J.
631 Locust Street
Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US
05 / Juncker, Llyod, E.
445 DeKemper Lane
Mt. Vernon, IN 47620 / US
06 / Reshad, Jamsheed
5299 Brook Hollow Drive
Newburgh, IN 47630 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Neath, Susannah Mairi
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Neath, Susannah Mairi
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date08015787.827.07.2001
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2000062786028.07.2000         Original published format: US 627860
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025584
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025584
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B62D55/10, B62D55/04, B62D55/30
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Rahmen für eine Verfolgungsvorrichtung[2009/08]
English:Frame for track apparatus[2009/08]
French:Cadre pour appareil de suivi[2009/08]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/40]
10.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2010Fee for grant paid
30.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01961777.8  / EP1226067
Opposition(s)17.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
08.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
NL16.06.2010
TR16.06.2010
IE27.07.2010
LU27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
GB16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
NL16.06.2010
IE27.07.2010
LU27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
GB16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/43]AT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
NL16.06.2010
IE27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
GB16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/36]AT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
NL16.06.2010
IE27.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/25]AT16.06.2010
BE16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
DK16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
NL16.06.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
GR17.09.2010
PT18.10.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US4448273  (BARBIERI LOUIS C [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9804451  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]US3869010  (STEDMAN ROBERT N) [A] 1-6 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB818976  (KURT HUELLE) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3146511  (TECHNOLOGY INTERTRADE EST [LI]) [A] 1-6 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO0002765  (AGTRACKS INC [US], et al) [A] 7-13 * abstract *;
 [A]US5829848  (KELDERMAN GARY L [US]) [A] 7-13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0974510  (MAK SYSTEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 7-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US1774835  (LOMBARD ALVIN O) [A] 7-13 * figure 1; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US1388637  (FRENCH JAMES C) [A] 7-13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5452949