Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2036528

EP2036528 - Blood plasma container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.05.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2016New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heinz Meise GmbH
Medizintechnik Im Gewerbepark 6
58579 Schalksmühle / DE
For all designated states
Haemonetics Corporation
400 Wood Road
Braintree, MA 02184 / US
[2011/03]
Former [2009/12]For all designated states
Heinz Meise GmbH
Medizintechnik Im Gewerbepark 6
58579 Schalksmühle / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Meise, Heinz
Ober-Reeswinkel 21
D-58579 Schalksmühle / DE
 [2009/12]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Kötter, Ulrich
Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen Patentanwälte Körnerstraße 27
58095 Hagen / DE
Former [2009/12]Kötter, Ulrich
Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen Patentanwälte Körnerstraße 27
58095 Hagen / DE
Application number, filing date08016046.811.09.2008
[2009/12]
Priority number, dateDE20072012912U14.09.2007         Original published format: DE 202007012912 U
[2009/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2036528
Date:18.03.2009
Language:DE
[2009/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2036528
Date:04.11.2009
[2009/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2036528
Date:20.06.2012
Language:DE
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/05, A61J1/14
[2012/10]
Former International [2009/12]A61J1/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/12]
TitleGerman:Blutplasma-Behälter[2009/12]
English:Blood plasma container[2009/12]
French:Récipient à plasma[2009/12]
Examination procedure04.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/24]
10.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2012Fee for grant paid
24.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.09.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Octapharma Plasma GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 11
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Ralf, et al
Paul & Albrecht
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Stresemannallee 4b
41460 Neuss / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Octapharma Plasma GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Strasse 11
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Ralf, et al
Paul & Albrecht
Patentanwaltssozietät
Hellersbergstrasse 18
41460 Neuss / DE
Former [2012/42]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2012   
Deutsche Gesellschaft für Humanplasma mbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 11
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Albrecht, Ralf, et al
Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18
41460 Neuss / DE
26.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1630/15
15.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
18.12.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2015/51]
19.01.2016Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.09.2008
CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
MT20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
TR20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
AT11.09.2013
[2015/12]
Former [2014/34]HU11.09.2008
CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
MT20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
TR20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2014/27]CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
MT20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
TR20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
LU11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2014/21]CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
MT20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
TR20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2013/51]CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
MT20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2013/40]CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
FR01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2013/34]CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
BG20.09.2012
GB20.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Former [2013/33]CY20.06.2012
DK20.06.2012
EE20.06.2012
FI20.06.2012
HR20.06.2012
LT20.06.2012
LV20.06.2012
NL20.06.2012
RO20.06.2012
SI20.06.2012
SK20.06.2012
IE11.09.2012
GR21.09.2012
BE30.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
ES01.10.2012
IS20.10.2012
PT22.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB1216534  (BRAUN INTERNAT G M B H B [CH]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 92 - page 2, line 16; figures 1,2 * [A] 7-11;
 [XA]GB1434967  (RIT RECH IND THERAPEUT) [X] 1-5 * page 1, lines 10-18; figure 3 * [A] 11;
 [XPA]WO2008041564  (NIPRO CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-5 * abstract * [AP] 11;
 [A]DE20310937U  (HEINZ MEISE GMBH [DE]) [A] 6 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2007181605
by applicantDE9317359U
 DE20010825U
    - Physiologie, VERLAG URBAN & SCHWARZENBERG, (1992), page 261