Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2169550

EP2169550 - Method for manipulating objects in a SOA registry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2010/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Nikolov, Dragomir
Mladost 4, bl. 491, entr. 3 apt.17
1715 Sofia / BG
02 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
03 / Wiedmann, Jochen
Schillerstrasse 34
72800 Eningen / DE
04 / Schoening, Harald Dr.
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
 [2012/51]
Former [2010/13]01 / Nikolov, Dragomir
Mladost 4, bl. 491, entr. 3 apt.17
1715 Sofia / BG
02 / Pankov, Alexander
Darvenista, bl. 17, entr. 5 apt.91
1756 Sofia / BG
03 / Wiedmann, Jochen
Schillerstrasse 34
72800 Eningen / DE
04 / Schoening, Harald Dr.
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
Former [2010/13]Heselberger, Johannes , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date08016448.618.09.2008
[2010/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2169550
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2169550
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/46
[2010/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Manipulation von Objekten in einer SOA-Registry[2010/13]
English:Method for manipulating objects in a SOA registry[2010/13]
French:Procédé de manipulation d'objets dans un enregistrement SOA[2010/13]
Examination procedure18.09.2008Examination requested  [2010/13]
17.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2013Fee for grant paid
01.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2009
Opposition(s)20.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.09.2008
AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
GR17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.09.2013
LU18.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
[2015/38]
Former [2015/34]HU18.09.2008
AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.09.2013
LU18.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2015/32]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
MT17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
TR17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/37]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
FR30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
IE18.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
MC17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/14]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
NL17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
IT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
RO17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
CZ17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
SK17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
DK17.04.2013
EE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
CY17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
HR17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
LV17.04.2013
PL17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
BG17.07.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT17.04.2013
BE17.04.2013
FI17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
SE17.04.2013
SI17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT17.04.2013
LT17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
ES28.07.2013
IS17.08.2013
PT19.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT17.04.2013
NO17.07.2013
PT19.08.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1970802  (SOFTWARE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  ANONYMOUS, "Web Services Made Easier, The Java APIs and Architectures for XML", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20011116112311/http://java.sun.com/xml/webservices.pdf, (20041124), XP002307219 [X] 1-13 * page 19 - page 21 * * page 24 - page 25 *
 [A]  ERICH GAMMA ET AL, "Design Patterns: elements of reusable object-oriented software passage", DESIGN PATTERNS. ELEMENTS OF REUSABLE OBJECT-ORIENTED SOFTWARE, XX, XX, (19950101), pages 1 - 20, XP002200550 [A] 1-13 * page 10 - page 13 *
Examination   SMITH M ET AL, "Model Driven Development of Service-Oriented Grid Applications", TELECOMMUNICATIONS, 2005. AICT-ICIW '06. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON I NTERNET AND WEB APPLICATIONS AND SERVICES/ADVANCED INTERNATIONAL CONFE RENCE ON GUADELOPE, FRENCH CARIBBEAN 19-25 FEB. 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE LNKD- DOI:10.1109/AICT-ICIW.2, (20060219), ISBN 978-0-7695-2522-8, pages 139 - 139, XP010898462

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AICT-ICIW.2006.130