Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028187

EP2028187 - Human and mouse targeting peptides identified by phage display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.01.2014
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.02.2014  [2014/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Office of General Council, 201 West Seventh Street
Austin, TX 78701 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Arap, Wadih
7171 Buffalo Speedway No. 328
Houston, TX 77025 / US
02 / Pasqualini, Renata
7171 Buffalo Speedway No. 328
Houston, TX 77025 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Weiss, Wolfgang , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date08016646.507.09.2001
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateUS20000231266P08.09.2000         Original published format: US 231266 P
US2001076510117.01.2001         Original published format: US 765101
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028187
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07K7/00, C07K7/04, C07K17/02, A61K39/00, A61K38/03, A61K38/04
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Durch Phagenanzeigen identifizierte, auf Menschen und Mäuse abgezielte Peptide[2009/09]
English:Human and mouse targeting peptides identified by phage display[2009/09]
French:Peptides cibles chez l'homme et la souris identifiées par l'affichage de phases[2009/09]
Examination procedure22.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
27.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/06]
12.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/06]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01968603.9  / EP1322755
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010968603) is  17.07.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201313   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9946284  (BURNHAM INST [US]) [A] 1-18;
 [A]  - PASQUALINI RENATA ET AL, "Aminopeptidase N is a receptor for tumor-homing peptides and a target for inhibiting angiogenesis", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD.; US, (20000201), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 722 - 727, XP002180667 [A] 1-18
 [A]  - ALLIOT F ET AL, "Pericytes and periendothelial cells of brain parenchyma vessels co-express aminopeptidase N, aminopeptidase A, and nestin", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, (19991101), vol. 58, no. 3, ISSN 0360-4012, pages 367 - 378, XP002509735

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4547(19991101)58:3<367::AID-JNR2>3.0.CO;2-T
 [A]  - SCHLINGEMANN R O ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL EXPRESSION OF MARKERS FOR ENDOTHELIAL CELLS, PERICYTES, AND BASAL LAMINA IN THE MICROVASCULATURE OF TUMORS AND GRANULATION TISSUE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF SURGICAL PATHOLOGY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19910601), vol. 138, no. 6, ISSN 0147-5185, pages 1335 - 1347, XP000671285
 [A]  - ARAP W ET AL, "CANCER TREATMENT BY TARGETED DRUG DELIVERY TO TUMOR VASCULATURE IN A MOUSE MODEL", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19980116), vol. 279, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 377 - 380, XP000857470 [A] 1-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.279.5349.377
 [A]  - RAJOTTE D ET AL, "Molecular heterogeneity of the vacular endothelium revealed by in vivo phage display", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199807), vol. 102, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 430 - 437, XP002128873 [A] 1-18

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI3008
 [T]  - MARCHIÒ SERENA ET AL, "Aminopeptidase A is a functional target in angiogenic blood vessels.", CANCER CELL FEB 2004, (200402), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1535-6108, pages 151 - 162, XP002509736 [T] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1535-6108(04)00025-X
by applicantUS5223409
 US5622699
 US6068829
 US5840841
 US5705610
 US5670312
 US5492807
 US5206347
 US5021236
 US4472509
 US3817837
 US3850752
 US3939350
 US3996345
 US4277437
 US4275149
 US4366241
 US5603872
 US5401511
 US5889155
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, pages 624 - 652
    - ANAND-APTE B ET AL., "Inhibition of angiogenesis by tissue inhibitor of metallopeinase-3", INVEST OPTHAMOL. VIS. SCI., (1997), vol. 38, pages 817 - 823
    - ARAP, W.; PASQUALINI R.; RUOSLAHTI, E., "Cancer treatment by targeted drug delivery to tumor vasculature", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 377 - 380
    - ARAP, W.; PASQUALINI, R.; RUOSLAHTI, E, "Chemotherapy targeted to tumor vasculature", CURR OPIN ONCOL, (1998), vol. 10, pages 560 - 565
    - BAICHWAL; SUGDEN, Gene Transfer, PLENUM PRESS, (1986), pages 117 - 148
    - BALDWIN, R. W. ET AL., "Monoclonal antibody-defined antigens on tumor cells", BIOMEMBRANES, (1983), vol. 11, pages 285 - 312
    - BARANY; MERRIFIELD, The Peptides, Gross and Meienhofer, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1979), pages 1 - 284
    - BARTLETT, J.S. ET AL., "Targeted adeno-associated virus vector transduction of nonpermissive cells mediated by a bispecific Fab'gamma)2 antibody", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 181 - 186
    - KRITHIVAS, A. ET AL., "Isolation of a common receptor for coxsackie B viruses and adenoviruses 2 and 5", SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 275, pages 1320 - 1322
    - BIELENBERG, D. R. ET AL., "Expression of interferon-beta is associated with growth arrest of murine and human epidermal cells", J INVEST DERMATOL, (1999), vol. 112, pages 802 - 9
    - BOEHM T ET AL., "Antiangiogenic therapy of experimental cancer does not induce acquired drug resistance", NATURE, (1997), vol. 390, pages 404 - 407
    - BOON, T.; OLD, L. J., "Cancer Tumor antigens", CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 9, pages 681 - 683
    - BOSSEMEYER, D. ET AL., "Phosphotransferase and substrate binding mechanism of the cAMP-dependent protein kinase catalytic subunit from porcine heart as deduced from the 2.0 A structure of the complex with Mn 2+ adenylyn imidiophosphate and inhibitor peptide PKI(5-24", EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 849 - 859
    - "The role of marrow endothelium in the localization of metastastic cancer cells to bone", BRODT, Bone Metastasis- mechanisms and pathophysiology, (1996), pages 17 - 23
    - BROOKS PC; CLARK RA; CHERESH DA., "Requirement of vascular integrin avB3 for angiogenesis", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 264, pages 569 - 571
    - BROOKS PC ET AL., "Anti- integrin avß3 blocks human breast cancer growth and angiogenesis in human skin", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 96, pages 1815 - 1822
    - BROOKS, P.C. ET AL., "Localization of matrix metalloproteinase MMP-2 to the surface of invasive cells by interaction with integrin alpha v beta 3", CELL, (1996), vol. 85, pages 683 - 693
    - BROOKS, P.C. ET AL., "Integrin avj33 antagonists promote tumor regression by inducing apoptosis of angiogenic blood vessels", CELL, (1994), vol. 79, pages 1157 - 1164
    - BROUSSET, P. ET AL., "Detection of Epstein-Barr virus messenger RNA in Reed-Stemberg cells of Hodgkin's disease by in situ hybridization with biotinylated probes on specially processed modified acetone methyl benzoate xylene (ModAMeX) sections", BLOOD, (1991), vol. 77, pages 1781 - 6
    - BURG M ET AL., "Identification of NG2 proteoglycan-binding peptides that home to tumor neovasculature", CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 58, pages 2869 - 2874
    - BURG, M.A. ET AL., "NG2 proteoglycan-binding peptides target tumor neovasculature", CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 59, pages 2869 - 2874
    - CAMPBELL ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2001), vol. 158, pages 25 - 32
    - CAO Y. ET AL., "Expression of angiostatin cDNA in a murine fibrosarcoma suppresses primary tumor growth and produces long-term dormancy of metastases", J. CLIN. INVEST, (1998), vol. 101, pages 1055 - 1063
    - CARTER, H. B.; PIANTADOSI, S.; ISAACS, J. T., "Clinical evidence for and implications of the multistep development of prostate cancer", J UROL, (1990), vol. 143, pages 742 - 746
    - CHANG, K. L.; L. M. WEISS, "The association of the Epstein-Barr virus with malignant lymphoma", BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (1996), vol. 50, pages 459 - 67
    - CHEN; OKAYAMA, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, pages 2745 - 2752
    - CHEN ET AL., J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 78, pages 404 - 416
    - CHINNI ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1557 - 64
    - CLARK, E.A.; BRUGGE, J.S., "Integrins and signal transduction pathways: the road taken", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 268, pages 233 - 238
    - COFFIN ET AL., Virology, RAVEN PRESS, (1990), pages 1437 - 1500
    - CORTESE, 1. ET AL., "Identification of peptides specific for cerebrospinal fluid antibodies in multiple sclerosis by using phage libraries", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1996), vol. 93, pages 11063 - 11067
    - COUCH ET AL., AM. REV. RESP. DIS., (1963), vol. 88, pages 394 - 403
    - COUPAR ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 68, pages 1 - 10
    - COX, D. R., "Regression models and life tables", JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY, (1972), vol. 74, pages 187 - 220
    - CURIEL, D.T, "Strategies to adapt adenoviral vectors for targeted delivery", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (1999), vol. 886, pages 158 - 171
    - DEFILIPPI, P. ET AL., "Integrin-mediated signal transduction in human endothelial cells: analysis of tyrosine phosphorylation events", CELL ADH. COMMUN., (1994), vol. 87, pages 75 - 86
    - DELANNET, M. ET AL., "Specific roles of the avBl, avB3, and avB5 integrins in avian neural crest cell adhesion and migration on vitronectin", DEVELOPMENT, (1994), vol. 120, pages 2687 - 702
    - DELPINO ET AL., MOL. MEMBR. BIOL., (1998), vol. 15, pages 21 - 26
    - DENTE, L. ET AL., "Modified phage peptide libraries as a tool to study specificity of phosphorylation and recognition of tyrosine containing peptides", J. MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 269, pages 694 - 703
    - DEROSSI, D.; CHASSAING, G.; PROCHIANTZ, A., "Trojan peptides: the penetratin system for intracellular delivery", TRENDS CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 84 - 87
    - DEROSSI, D. ET AL., "The third helix of Antennapedia homeodomain translocates through biological membranes", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 10444 - 10450
    - DMTTRIEV, I. ET AL., "An adenovirus vector with genetically modified fibers demonstrates expanded tropism via utilization of a coxsackie virus and adenovirus receptor-independent cell entry mechanism", J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 9706 - 9713
    - DOUGLAS, J.T. ET AL., "Targeted gene delivery by tropism-modified adenoviral vectors", NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 1574 - 1578
    - DUNN, I.S., "Mammalian cell binding and transfection , mediated by surface-modified bacteriophage lambda", BIOCHIMIE, (1996), vol. 78, pages 856 - 861
    - DYBWAD, A. ET AL., "Identification of new B cell epitopes in the sera of rheumatoid arthritis patients using a random nanopeptide phage library", EUR J IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 23, pages 3189 - 3193
    - EISEN, T. ET AL., "Continuous low dose Thalidomide: a phase II study in advanced melanoma, renal cell, ovarian and breast cancer", BR J CANCER, (2000), vol. 82, pages 812 - 817
    - ELLERBY HM ET AL., "Anti-cancer Activity of Targeted proapoptotic peptides", NATURE MED, (1999), vol. 9, pages 1032 - 1038
    - ENBLAD, G. ET AL., "Lack of correlation between EBV serology and presence of EBV in the Hodgkin and Reed-Stemberg cells of patients with Hodgkin's disease", INT J CANCER, (1997), vol. 72, pages 394 - 7
    - ENGELSTADTER M ET AL., "Targeting human T cells by retroviral vectors displaying antibody domains selected from a phage display library", HUM GENE THER., (2000), vol. 11, pages 293 - 303
    - ENGERMAN, R.L.; KERN, T.S., "Hyperglycemia as a cause of diabetic retinopathy", METABOLISM, (1986), vol. 35, no. SL, pages 20 - 23
    - FERRARA, N.; DAVIS-SMYTH, T., "The biology of vascular endothelial growth factor", ENDOCR. REV., (1997), vol. 18, pages 4 - 25
    - FILARDO, E.J.; CHERESH, D.A., "A B turn in the cytoplasmic tail of the integrin av subunit influences conformation and ligand binding of avB3", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 4641 - 4647
    - FILARDO, E.J.; CHERESH, D.A., "A structural basis for bidirectional integrin signalling", PRINCESS TAKAMATSU SYMP., (1994), vol. 24, pages 106 - 117
    - FILARDO, E.J. ET AL., "Requirement of the NPXY motif in the integrin 83 subunit cytoplasmic tail for melanoma cell migration in vitro and in vivo", J. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 130, pages 441 - 450
    - FOLKMAN J., "Addressing tumor blood vessels", NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, page 510
    - FOLKMAN J., "Angiogenesis in cancer, vascular, rheumatoid and other disease", NATURE MED, (1995), vol. 1, pages 27 - 31
    - FOLKMAN, J., "Antiangiogenic gene therapy", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1998), vol. 95, pages 9064 - 9066
    - FRIEDLANDER M ET AL., "Definition of two angiogenic pathways by distinct av integrins", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 1500 - 1502
    - FRIEDLANDER M ET AL., "Involvement of integrins avp3 and avß5 in ocular neovascular diseases", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 9764 - 9769
    - FRIEDMANN, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1275 - 1281
    - FRISCH SM.; RUOSLAHTI E., "Integrins and anoikis", CUR. OPIN. IN CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 701 - 706
    - FURUYA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 6167 - 75
    - GHOSH-CHOUDHURY ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 1733 - 1739
    - GINGRICH JR ET AL., "Metastatic prostate cancer in a transgenic mouse", CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 4096 - 4102
    - GIROD A ET AL., "Genetic capsid modifications allow efficient re-targeting of adeno-associated virus type 2", NAT MED, (1999), vol. 5, pages 1052 - 1056
    - GOLD R., "Differenitation between Cellular Apoptosis ad Necrosis by the Combined Use of In Situ Tailing Translation Techniques", LAB. INVEST., (1994), vol. 71, page 219
    - GOLDMAN CK ET AL., "Targeted gene delivery to Karposi's sarcoma cells via the fibroblast growth factor receptor", CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 1447 - 1451
    - GOLDMAN, C.K. ET AL., "Targeted gene delivery to Karposi's sarcoma cells via the fibroblast growth factor receptor", CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 1447 - 1451
    - GOMEZ-FOIX ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 25129 - 25134
    - GOPAL, MOL. CELL BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 1188 - 1190
    - GRACE, M. J. ET AL., "The use of laser scanning cytometry to assess depth of penetration of adenovirus p53 gene therapy in human xenograft biopsies", AM JPATHOL, (1999), vol. 155, pages 1869 - 78
    - GRAHAM; PREVEC, Methods in Molecular Biology: Gene Transfer and Expression Protocol, HUMANA PRESS, (1991), vol. 7, pages 109 - 128
    - GRAHAM; VAN DER EB, VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, pages 456 - 467
    - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, pages 59 - 72
    - GRAM, H. ET AL., "Identification of phosphopeptide ligands for Src-homology 2 (SH2) domain of Grb2 by phage display", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 246, pages 633 - 637
    - GREENBERG NM ET AL., "Prostate cancer in a transgenic mouse", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 3439 - 3443
    - GRISCELLI F. LI H. ET AL., "Angiostatin gene transfer: inhibition of tumor growth in vivo by blockage of endothelial cell proliferation associated with a mitosis arrest", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 6367 - 72
    - GRUNHAUS; HORWITZ, SEMINAR IN VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 237 - 252
    - GUNGE, N. ET AL., "Relocation of a cytoplasmic yeast linear plasmid to the nucleus is associated with circularization via nonhomologous recombination involving inverted terminal repeats", MOL GEN GENET, (2000), vol. 263, pages 846 - 853
    - HALL, H. ET AL., "Inhibition of FGF-stimulated phosphatidylinositol hydrolysis and neuron outgrowth by a cell -membrane permeable phosphopeptide", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 6, pages 580 - 587
    - HAMMES HP ET AL., "Subcutaneous injection of a cyclic peptide antagonist of vitronectin receptor-type integrins inhibits retinal neovascularization", NATURE MED., (1996), vol. 2, pages 529 - 533
    - HANAHAN, D.; FOLKMAN, J., "Patterns and Emerging Mechanisms of the Angiogenic Switch during Tumorogenesis", CELL, (1996), vol. 86, pages 353 - 364
    - HANSEN, A.S. ET AL., "A mouse aminopeptidase-N is a marker for antigen presenting cells and apears to be co-expressed with major histocompatibility complex class II molecules", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 23, pages 2358 - 64
    - HART SL ET AL., "Cell binding and internalization by filamentous phage displaying a cyclic Arg-Gly- Asp-containing peptide", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 12468 - 12474
    - "Structure, biochemical properties, and biological functions of integrin cytoplasmic domains", HEMLER, M. ET AL., Integrins: The Biological Problems, CRC PRESS, INC., (1994), pages 1 - 35
    - "Hendrix RW. Evolution: the long evolutionary reach of viruses", CURRENT BIOL., (1999), vol. 9, pages 914 - 917
    - HENRY, L. ET AL., "Characterization of the knob domain of the adenovirus type 5 fiber protein expressed in E. coli", J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 5239 - 5246
    - HERBST, H. ET AL., "Distribution and phenotype of Epstein-Barr virus- harboring cells in Hodgkin's disease", BLOOD, (1992), vol. 80, pages 484 - 91
    - HERBST, H. ET AL., "Epstein-Barr virus latent membrane protein expression in. Hodgkin and Reed-Sternberg cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1991), vol. 88, pages 4766 - 70
    - HERMONAT; MUZYCSKA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6466 - 6470
    - HERNDIER BG ET AL., "Characterization of a human Kaposi's sarcoma cell line that induces angiogenic tumors in animals", AIDS, (1996), vol. 8, pages 575 - 581
    - HERSDORFFER ET AL., DNA CELL BIOL., (1990), vol. 9, pages 713 - 723
    - HERZ; GERARD, PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2812 - 2816
    - HEYWOOD, S.P.; HOOPER, N.M., "Development and application of a fluorometric assay for mammalian membrane dipeptidase", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 226, pages 10 - 14
    - HONG, S.S. ET AL., "Enhancement of adenovirus-mediated gene delivery by use of an oligopeptide with dual binding specificity", HUM. GENE THER., (1999), vol. 10, pages 2577 - 2586
    - HONG, S.S. ET AL., "Adenovirus type 5 fiber knob binds to MHC class I alpha-2 domain at the surface of human epithelial and B lymphoblastoid cells", EMBO J., (1997), vol. 16, pages 2294 - 2306
    - HORWICH ET AL., J. VIROL., (1990), vol. 64, pages 642 - 650
    - HUGHES ET AL., CANCER RES., (1989), vol. 49, pages 4452 - 54
    - HYNES, R.O., "Integrins: versatility, modulation and signaling in cell adhesion", CELL, (1992), vol. 69, pages 11 - 25
    - IVANENKOV, V.; FELICI, F.; MENON, A.G., "Uptake and intracellular fate of phage display vectors in mammalian cells", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1999), vol. 1448, pages 450 - 462
    - IVANENKOV, V.V.; FELICI, F.; MENON, A.G., "Targeted delivery of multivalent phage display vectors into mammalian cells", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1999), vol. 1448, pages 463 - 472
    - JARRETT, A. F.; A. A. ARMSTRONG; E. ALEXANDER., "Epidemiology of EBV and Hodgkin's lymphoma", ANN ONCOL, (1996), vol. 7, pages 5 - 10
    - JARRETT, R. F.; J. MACKENZIE, "Epstein-Barr virus and other candidate viruses in the pathogenesis of Hodgkin's disease", SEMIN HEMATOL, (1999), vol. 36, pages 260 - 9
    - JOLIOT, A.H. ET AL., "alpha-2,8-Polysialic acid is the neuronal surface receptor of antennapedia homeobox peptide", NEW BIOL., (1991), vol. 3, pages 1121 - 1131
    - JOLIOT, A.H. ET AL., "Antennapedia homeobox peptide regulates neural morphogenesis", PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.SA., (1991), vol. 88, pages 1864 - 1868
    - JONES; SHENK, CELL, (1978), vol. 13, pages 181 - 188
    - KAPLAN, E. L. A. M., P., "Nonparametric estimation from incomplete observations", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN STATISTICAL ASSOCIATION, (1958), vol. 53, pages 457 - 481
    - KARLSSON ET AL., EMBO J., (1986), vol. 5, pages 2377 - 2385
    - KASONO, K. ET AL., "Selective gene delivery to head and neck cancer cells via an integrin targeted adenoviral vector", CLIN CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 5, pages 2571 - 2579
    - KASSNER, P.D. ET AL., "Genetic selection of phage engineered for receptor-mediated gene transfer to mammalian cells", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1999), vol. 264, pages 921 - 928
    - KLEMKE, R.L. ET AL., "Receptor tyrosine kinase signaling required for integrin avB5 -directed cell motility but not adhesion on vitronectin", J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 127, pages 859 - 866
    - KOIVUNEN E ET AL., "Tumor targeting with a selective gelatinase inhibitor", NATURE BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 768 - 774
    - KOIVUNEN E; GAY DA; RUOSLAHTI E., "Selection of peptides binding to the a5ß1 integrin from phage display library", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 20205 - 20210
    - KOIVUNEN E; WANG B; RUOSLAHTI E., "Phage display libraries displaying cyclic peptides with different ring sizes: ligand specificities of the RGD-directed integrins", BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 265 - 270
    - KOIVUNEN, E. ET AL., "Integrin-binding peptides derived from phage display libraries", METHODS MOL BIOL, (1999), vol. 129, pages 3 - 17
    - KOLANUS, W.; SEED, B., "Integrins and inside-out signal transduction: converging signals from PKC and PIP3", CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 725 - 731
    - KOLONIN MG.; FINLEY RL JR., "Targeting cyclin-dependent kinases in Drosophila with peptide aptamers", PROC. OF THE NATL. ACAD. OF SCI. USA., (1998), vol. 95, pages 14266 - 71
    - KONG HL; CRYSTAL RG., GENE THERAPY STRATEGIES FOR TUMOR ANTIANGIOGENESIS
    - KOUZMITCHEVA G. A. ET AL., "Identifying diagnostic peptides for lyme disease through epitope discovery", CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 8, pages 150 - 60
    - KOZARSKY, K. ET AL., "Effective treatment of familial hypercholesterolaemia in the mouse model using adenovirus-mediated transfer of the VLDL receptor gene", NAT. GENET., (1996), vol. 13, pages 54 - 62
    - KRASNYKH, V. ET AL., "Characterization of an adenovirus vector containing a heterologous peptide epitope in the HI loop of the fiber knob", J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 1844 - 1852
    - KRASNYKH, V. ET AL., "Generation of recombinant adenovirus vectors with modified fibers for altering viral tropism", J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 6839 - 6846
    - LANE T.; SHAH J., "Clinical features and management of benign prostatic hyperplasia", HOSPITAL MEDICINE, (1999), vol. 60, no. 10, pages 705 - 9
    - LAROCCA D ET AL., "Gene transfer to mammalian cells using genetically. targeted filamentous bacteriophage", FASEB J, (1999), vol. 13, pages 727 - 734
    - LAROCCA, D. ET AL., "Targeting bacteriophage to mammalian cell surface receptors for gene delivery", HUM GENE THER, (1998), vol. 9, pages 2393 - 2399
    - LE GAL LA SALLE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 988 - 990
    - LE ROUX, I. ET AL., "Neurotrophic activity of the Antennapedia homeodomain depends on its specific DNA-binding properties", PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. U.S.A., (1993), vol. 90, pages 9120 - 9124
    - LEVRERO ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 101, pages 195 - 202
    - LEWIS, J.M.; CHERESH, D.A.; SCHWARTZ, M.A., "Protein kinase C regulates avß5- dependent cytoskeletal associations and focal adhesion kinase phosphorylation", J. CELL BIOL., (1996), vol. 134, pages 1323 - 1332
    - LIN, T.H. ET AL., "Integrin-mediated activation of MAP kinase is independent of FAK: evidence for dual integrin signalling pathways in fibroblast", J. CELL BIOL., (1997), vol. 136, pages 1385 - 1395
    - LONGHURST, C.M.; JENNINGS, L.K., "Integrin-mediated signal transduction", CELL MOL. LIFE SCI., (1998), vol. 54, pages 514 - 526
    - LOOK AT ET AL., "Human myeloid plasma membrane glycoprotein CD13 (gp150) is identical to aminopeptidase N", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1989), vol. 83, pages 1299 - 1307
    - LOUIS, N. ET AL., "Cell- binding domain of adenovirus serotype 2 fiber", J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 4104 - 4106
    - LUNARDI, C. ET AL., "Systemic sclerosis immunoglobulin G autoantibodies bind the human cytomegalovirus late protein UL94 and induce apoptosis in human endothelial cells [In Process Citation", NAT MED, (2000), vol. 6, pages 1183 - 1186
    - LYNCH, C.M. ET AL., "Adeno-associated virus vectors for vascular gene delivery", CIRC RES, (1997), vol. 80, pages 497 - 505
    - LYONS, S. F.; D. N. LIEBOWITZ., "The roles of human viruses in the pathogenesis of lymphoma", SEMIN ONCOL, (1998), vol. 25, pages 461 - 75
    - MACGREGOR, G.R.; CASKEY, C.T., "Construction of plasmids that express E. coli beta- galactosidase in mammalian cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1989), vol. 17, page 2365
    - MAHBOUBI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 3837 - 3846
    - MANN ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 153 - 159
    - MARKOWITZ ET AL., J. VIROL., (1988), vol. 62, pages 1120 - 1124
    - MARTIN F ET AL., "Retrovirus targeting by tropism restriction to melanoma cells", J VIROL, (1999), vol. 73, pages 6923 - 6929
    - MARTINY-BARON G; MARME D., "VEGF-mediated tumor angiogenesis: a new target for cancer therapy", CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 6, pages 675 - 680
    - MENNUNI, C. ET AL., "Selection of phage-displayed peptides mimicking type 1 diabetes- specific epitopes", J AUTOIMMUN, (1996), vol. 9, pages 431 - 436
    - MERRIFIELD, SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 232, pages 341 - 347
    - MICHAEL, S.I. ET AL., "Addition of a short peptide ligand to the adenovirus fiber protein", GENE THER., (1995), vol. 2, pages 660 - 668
    - MIKOLAJCZYK SD. ET AL., "A precursor form of prostate-specific antigen is more highly elevated in prostatecancer compared with benign transition zone prostate tissue", CANCER RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 756 - 9
    - MILLER CR ET AL., "Differential susceptibility of primary and established human glioma cells to adenovirus infection: targeting via the epidermal growth factor receptor achieves fiber receptor independent gene transfer", CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, pages 5738 - 5748
    - MOTTI, C. ET AL., "Recognition by human sera and immunogenicity of HBsAg mimotopes selected from an M13 phage display library", GENE, (1994), vol. 146, pages 191 - 198
    - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932
    - MUSTONEN T; ALITALO K, "Endothelial receptor tyrosine kinases involved in angiogenesis", J. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 129, pages 895 - 898
    - MUZYCZKA N., "Adeno-associated virus (AAV) vectors: will they work?", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 94, page 1351
    - NICOLAS; RUBINSTEIN, Vectors: A survey of molecular cloning vectors and their uses, (1988), pages 494 - 513
    - NICOLAU ET AL., METHODS ENZYMEI., (1987), vol. 149, pages 157 - 176
    - OLD, L. J., "Cancer immunology: the search for specificity-G. H. A. Clowes Memorial lecture", CANCER RES, (1981), vol. 41, pages 361 - 375
    - OLOFSSON, B. ET AL., "Current Biology of VEGF-B and VEGF-C", CURR OP BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 10, pages 528 - 535
    - OLOFSSON, B. ET AL., "Vascular Endothelial Growth factor B, a novel growth factor for endothelial cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 2576 - 2581
    - OWENS, G. P. ET AL., "Cloning the antibody response in humans with chronic inflammatory disease: immunopanning of subacute sclerosing panencephalitis (SSPE) brain sections with antibody phage libraries prepared from SSPE brain enriches for antibody recognizing measles virus antigens in situ", J VIROL, (2000), vol. 74, pages 1533 - 7
    - PALLESEN, G. ET AL., "Expression of Epstein-Barr virus latent gene products in tumour cells of Hodgkin's disease [see comments", LANCET, (1991), vol. 337, pages 320 - 2
    - PASKIND ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1975), vol. 67, pages 242 - 248
    - PASQUALINI R; RUOSLAHTI E, "Organ targeting in vivo using phage display peptide libraries", NATURE, (1996), vol. 380, pages 364 - 366
    - PASQUALINI R; KOIVUNEN E; RUOSLAHTI E., "A peptide isolated from phage display libraiies is a structural and functional mimic of an RGD-binding site on integrins", J. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 130, pages 1189 - 1196
    - PASQUALINI R; KOIVUNEN E; RUOSLAHTI E., "av integrins as receptors for tumor targeting by circulating ligands", NATURE BIOTECHNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 542 - 546
    - PASQUALINI, R.; HEMLER, M. E., "Contrasting roles for integrin bl and b5 cytoplasmic domains in subcellular localization, cell proliferation, and cell migration", J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 125, pages 447 - 60
    - PASQUALINI, R., "Vascular Targeting with Phage Display Peptide Libraries", THE QUART. J. NUCL. MED., (1999), vol. 43, pages 159 - 162
    - PASQUALINI, R. ET AL., "Aminopeptidase N is a receptor for tumor-homing peptides and a target for inhibiting angiogenesis", CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 722 - 727
    - PELLEYMOUNTER ET AL., "Effects of the obese gene product on body weight regulation in ob/ob mice", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 269, pages 540 - 543
    - PEREBOEVA, L. A.; A. V. PEREBOEV; G. E. MORRIS, "Identification of antigenic sites on three hepatitis C virus proteins using phage-displayed peptide libraries", J MED VIROL, (1998), vol. 56, pages 105 - 11
    - PEREBOEVA, L. A. ET AL., "Hepatitis C epitopes from phage-displayed cDNA libraries and improved diagnosis with a chimeric antigen", J MED VIROL, (2000), vol. 60, pages 144 - 51
    - POTTER ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 7161 - 7165
    - POUL, M.A.; MARKS, J.D., "Targeted gene delivery to mammalian cells by filamentous bacteriophage", J MOL BIOL, (1999), vol. 288, pages 203 - 211
    - PREZZI, C. ET AL., "Selection of antigenic and immunogenic mimics of hepatitis C virus using sera from patients", J IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 156, pages 4504 - 4513
    - PREZZI, C. ET AL., "Selection of antigenic and immunogenic mimics of hepatitis C virus using sera from patients", J IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 156, pages 4504 - 13
    - PRICE, J.E. ET AL., "Tumorigenicity and metastasis of human breast carcinoma cells lines in nude mice", CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, pages 717 - 721
    - PUNTORIERO, G. ET AL., "Towards a solution for hepatitis C virus hypervariability:mimotopes of the hypervariable region 1 can induce antibodies cross-reacting with a large number of viral variants", EMBO J, (1998), vol. 17, pages 3521 - 3533
    - RACHER ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY TECHNIQUES, (1995), vol. 9, pages 169 - 174
    - RAGOT ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 361, pages 647 - 650
    - RAJOTTE D; RUOSLAHTI E., "Membrane dipeptidase is the receptor for a lung-targeting peptide identified by in vivo phage display", J BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 11593 - 11598
    - RAJOTTE D ET AL., "Molecular heterogeneity of the vascular endothelium revealed by in vivo phage display", J CLIN INVEST, (1998), vol. 102, pages 430 - 437
    - RAK JW; ST. CROIX BD; KERBEL RS., "Consequences of angiogenesis for tumor progression, metastasis and cancer", ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 3 - 18
    - RAZZAQUE, A. ET AL., "Detection of human herpesvirus 6 sequences in lymphoma tissues by immunohistochemistry and polymerase chain reactions", CANCER LETT, (1996), vol. 106, pages 221 - 6
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, pages 1035 - 1038
    - RENAN, RADIOTHER. ONCOL., (1990), vol. 19, pages 197 - 218
    - RENATA PASQUALINI, W. A.; DANIEL RAJOTTE; ERKKI RUOSLAHTI., Phage Display: A Laboratory manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), pages 22.21 - 22.24
    - RICH ET AL., HUM. GENE 77IER., (1993), vol. 4, pages 461 - 476
    - RIDGEWAY ET AL., Vectors: A Survey of Molecular Cloning Vectors and Their Uses, (1988), pages 467 - 492
    - RIPPE ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1990), vol. 10, pages 689 - 695
    - ROELVINK, P.W. ET AL., "Identification of a conserved receptor-binding site on the fiber proteins of CAR-recognizing adenoviridae", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, pages 1568 - 1571
    - ROMANCZUK, H. ET AL., "Modification of an adenoviral vector with biologically selected peptides: a novel strategy for gene delivery to cells of choice", HUM. GENE THER., (1999), vol. 10, pages 2615 - 2626
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 143 - 155
    - ROSENFELD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, pages 431 - 434
    - ROWLEY, M. J. ET AL., "Prediction of the immunodominant epitope of the pyruvate. dehydrogenase complex E2 in primary biliary cirrhosis using phage display", J IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 164, pages 3413 - 3419
    - RUOSLAHTI E. RGD, "sequence recognition sequences for integrins", ANNU. REV. CELL DEV. BIOL., (1996), vol. 12, pages 697 - 715
    - SAHIN, U. ET AL., "Human neoplasms elicit multiple specific immune responses in the autologous host", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1995), vol. 92, pages 11810 - 11813
    - SAHIN, U.; TURECI, O.; PFREUNDSCHUH, M., "Serological identification of human tumor antigens", CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 9, pages 709 - 716
    - SCALA, G. ET AL., "Selection of HIV-specific immunogenic epitopes by screening random peptide libraries with HIV-1-positive sera", J IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 162, pages 6155 - 6161
    - SCHLINGEMANN RO ET AL., "Expression of the high molecular weight melanoma-associated antigen by pericytes during angiogenesis in tumors and in healing wounds", AM. J. PATHOL., (1990), vol. 136, pages 1393 - 1405
    - SCHMITZ, R.; BAUMANN, G.; GRAM, H., "Catalytic specificity of phosphotyrosine kinase Blk, Lyn, c-Src and Syk as assessed by phage display", J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 260, pages 664 - 677
    - SHATTIL, S.J.; GINSBERG, M.H., "Perspectives series: cell adhesion in vascular biology. Integrin signaling in vascular biology", J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, pages 1 - 5
    - SHORT S M; TALBOTT GA; JULIANO RL., "Integrin-mediated Signaling Events in Human Endothelial Cells", MOL. BIOL. CELL, (1998), vol. 9, pages 1969 - 1980
    - SILVERSTEIN, JCI, (1984), vol. 74, pages 1625 - 1633
    - SMITH G. P., "Surface presentation of protein epitopes using bacteriophage expression system", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1991), vol. 2, pages 668 - 73
    - SMITH GP; SCOTT JK., "Libraries of peptides and proteins displayed in filamentous phage", METH. ENZYMOL., (1993), vol. 21, pages 228 - 257
    - SMITH GP; SCOTT JK., "Searching for peptide ligands with an epitope library", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317
    - SMITH, D. B.; K. S. JOHNSON, "Single-step purification of polypeptides expressed in Escherichia coli as fusions with glutathione S-transferase", GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40
    - SMITH, G. P., "Filamentous fusion phage: novel expression vectors that display cloned antigens on the virion surface", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 7
    - SMITH, G.P., "Surface presentation of protein epitopes using bacteriophage expression systems", CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 2, pages 668 - 673
    - SOLOWSKA J ET AL., "Cytoplasmic and transmembrane domains of integrin B1 and 63 subunits are functionally interchangeable", J. CELL BIOL., (1991), vol. 114, pages 1079 - 1088
    - STARATSCHEK-JOX, A. ET AL., "Detection of Epstein-Barr virus in Hodgkin-Reed-Sternberg cells : no evidence for the persistence of integrated viral fragments inLatent membrane protein-1 (LMP-1)-negative classical Hodgkin's disease", AM J PATHOL, (2000), vol. 156, pages 209 - 16
    - STERNBERG, N.; HOESS, R.H., "Display of peptides and proteins on the surface of bacteriophage lambda", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1609 - 1613
    - STOECKLE ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 2675 - 80
    - STRATFORD-PERRICAUDET; PERRICAUDET ET AL., Human Gene Transfer, JOHN LIBBEY EUROTEXT, (1991), pages 51 - 61
    - STRATFORD-PERRICAUDET ET AL., HUM. GENE. THER., (1990), vol. 1, pages 241 - 256
    - TAM ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1983), vol. 105, page 6442
    - TANAKA T ET AL., "Viral vector-targeted antiangiogenic gene therapy utilizing an angiostatin complementary DNA", CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, pages 3362 - 3369
    - TEMIN, Gene Transfer, PLENUM PRESS, (1986), pages 149 - 188
    - THEODORE, L. ET AL., "Intraneuronal delivery of protein kinase C pseudosubstrate leads to growth cone collapse", J. NEUROSCI., (1995), vol. 15, pages 7158 - 7167
    - TISCHER, E. ET AL., "the human Gene for Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 226, pages 11947 - 11954
    - TOP ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (1971), vol. 124, pages 155 - 160
    - TRIANTAFILOU ET AL., HUM. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 62, pages 764 - 770
    - TURECI, O.; SAHIN, U.; PFREUNDSCHUH, M., "Serological analysis of human tumor antigens: molecular definition and implications", MOL MED TODAY, (1997), vol. 3, pages 342 - 349
    - TUR-KASPA ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, pages 716 - 718
    - VARMUS ET AL., CELL, (1981), vol. 25, pages 23 - 36
    - VEIKKOLA, T.; ALITALO, K., "VEGFs, receptors and angiogenesis", SEMINAR CANCER BIO.L, (1999), vol. 9, pages 211 - 220
    - VIGNE, E. ET AL., "RGD inclusion in the hexon monomer provides adenovirus type 5-based vectors with a fiber knob-independent pathway for infection", J. VIROL., (1999), vol. 73, pages 5156 - 5161
    - VU, T.H. ET AL., "MMP-9/gelatinase B is a key regulator of growth plate angiogenesis and apoptosis of hypertrophic chondrocytes", CELL, (1998), vol. 93, pages 411 - 422
    - VUORI K.; RUOSLAHTI E., "Association of insulin receptor substrate-1 with integrins", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 1576 - 1578
    - WATHINS, S.J. ET AL., "The adenobody approach to viral targeting - specific and enhanced adenoviral gene delivery", GENE THER., (1997), vol. 4, pages 1004 - 1012
    - WATSON CA ET AL., "Variability among human umbilical vein endothelial cell cultures", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 268, pages 447 - 448
    - WEISS, L. M. ET AL., "Epstein-Barr viral DNA in tissues of Hodgkin's disease", AM J PATHOL, (1987), vol. 129, pages 86 - 91
    - WEISS, L. M. ET AL., "Epstein-Barr virus and Hodgkin's disease. A correlative in situ hybridization and polymerase chain reaction study", AM J PATHOL, (1991), vol. 139, pages 1259 - 65
    - WEITZMAN MD; WILSON JM; ECK SL., "Adenovirus vectors in cancer gene therapy", GENE THERAPY AND VECTOR SYSTEMS, (1997), vol. 2, pages 17 - 25
    - WELLS, J.A.; LOWMAN, H.B., "Rapid evolution of peptide and protein binding properties in vitro", CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1992), vol. 3, pages 355 - 362
    - WICKHAM TJ. ET AL., "Targeting endothelium for gene therapy via receptors up-regulated during angiogenesis and inflammation", CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1997), vol. 45, pages 149 - 151
    - WICKHAM, T.J., "Targeting adenovirus", GENE THER, (2000), vol. 7, pages 110 - 114
    - WICKHAM, T.J.; CARRION, M.E.; KOVESDI, 1., "Targeting of adenovirus penton base to new receptors through replacement of its RGD motif with other receptor-specific peptide motifs", GENE THER., (1995), vol. 2, pages 750 - 756
    - WICKHAM, T.J. ET AL., "Targeted adenovirus-mediated gene delivery to T-cells via CD3", J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 7663 - 7669
    - WICKHAM, T.J. ET AL., "Integrins alpha v beta 3 and alpha v beta 5 promote adenovirus internalization but not attachment", CELL, (1993), vol. 73, pages 309 - 319
    - WICKHAM, T.J. ET AL., "Adenovirus targeted to heparan-containing receptors increases its gene delivery efficiency to multiple cell types", NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 1570 - 1573
    - WICKHAM, T.J. ET AL., "Targeted adenovirus gene transfer to endothelial and smooth muscle cells by using bispecific antibodies", J. VIROL., (1996), vol. 70, pages 6831 - 6838
    - WICKHAM, T.J. ET AL., "Increased in vitro and in vivo gene transfer by adenovirus vectors containing chimeric fiber proteins", J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 8221 - 8229
    - WONG ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 10, pages 87 - 94
    - WU; WU, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 27, pages 887 - 892
    - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432
    - ZETTER BR., "Angiogenesis and tumor metastasis", ANN REV MED, (1998), vol. 49, pages 407 - 424
    - ZHANG ET AL., J. NATURE, (1994), vol. 372, page 425
    - ZHANG J; RUSSELL S., "Vectors for cancer gene therapy", CANCER MET. REV., (1996), vol. 3, pages 385 - 401
    - ZHANG, W., "Development and application of adenoviral vectors for gene therapy of cancer", CANCER GENE THER., (1999), vol. 6, pages 113 - 138
    - ZINI, S. ET AL., "Identification of metabolic pathways of brain angiotensin II and III using specific aminopeptidase inhibitors: predominant role of angiotensin III in the control of vasopressin release", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 11968 - 11973
 US20000231266
 US20010765101