Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2014677

EP2014677 - A-33 related antigens and their pharmacological uses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2010
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.06.2010  [2010/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2009/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Ashkenazi, Avi
1456 Tarrytown Street
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
02 / Fong, Sherman
19 Basinside Way
Almeda, CA 94502 / US
03 / Goddard, Audrey
72 Merced Avenue 9
San Francisco, CA 94127 / US
04 / Gurney, Austin L.
946 Diamond Street
San Francisco, CA 94114 / US
05 / Napier, Mary A.
1015 Hayne Road
Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US
06 / Tumas, Daniel
1961 Drake Drive
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
07 / Wood, William I.
15060 Montebello Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2009/03]
Representative(s)Denison, Christopher Marcus , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/03]Denison, Christopher Marcus , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date08017468.320.11.1998
[2009/03]
Priority number, dateUS19970066364P21.11.1997         Original published format: US 66364 P
US19980078936P20.03.1998         Original published format: US 78936 P
WO1998US1943717.09.1998         Original published format: PCT/US98/19437
[2009/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2014677
Date:14.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/705, G01N33/577, C12N15/12, C07K16/28, C12Q1/68
[2009/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2009/03]
TitleGerman:Mit A33 vewandte Antigene und deren pharmazeutische Verwendung[2009/03]
English:A-33 related antigens and their pharmacological uses[2009/03]
French:Antigènes apparentés à A33 et leurs utilisations pharmacologiques[2009/03]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure21.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/03]
12.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/25]
03.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/25]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98959543.4  / EP1032667
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
21.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[E]WO9946281  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [E] 1-12 * See PRO362 and examples 113, 114 *;
 EP1241180  [ ] (GENENTECH INC [US]) [ ] * L: potential double patenting *;
 [T]  - LANGNAESE K ET AL, "Cloning of Z39Ig, a novel gene with immunoglobulin-like domains located on human chromosome X", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA . GENE STRUCTURE AND EXPRESSION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000724), vol. 1492, no. 2-3, ISSN 0167-4781, pages 522 - 525, XP002276985 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4781(00)00131-7
by applicantUS4579827
 EP0199141
 US4675187
 US4816567
 US5750373
 US5571698
 US5403484
 US5223409
 US5658570
 US5693780
 US5681722
 US5750105
 US5756096
 EP0404097
 WO9311161
 US4275149
 US5364934
 WO8705330
 US4640835
 US4496689
 US4301144
 US4670417
 US4791192
 US4179337
 WO8905859
 US4399216
 US5010182
 EP0362179
 WO9013646
 EP0036776
 EP0073657
 GB2211504
 EP0117060
 EP0117058
 US4376110
 US4873
 US191
 US4736866
 WO9733551
 US5545807
 US5545806
 US5569825
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5661016
 WO9308829
 US4676980
 WO9100360
 WO9220373
 EP0003089
 WO9411026
 US4485045
 US4544545
 US5013556
 US3773919
 EP0616812
 EP0307247
 US5122469
    - MARTIN-PADURA, I. ET AL., J. CELL BIOL, (1998), vol. 142, no. 1, pages 117 - 27
    - WELT ET AL., J CLIN. ONCOL., (1990), vol. 8, pages 1894 - 1906
    - WELT ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 1561 - 1571
    - KABAT ET AL., NIH PUBL. NO.91-3242, (1991), vol. I, pages 647 - 669
    - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARKS ET AL., MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 211, pages 581 - 597
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329
    - PRESTA., CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 3 I
    - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. USA., (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1986), vol. 13, page 4331
    - ZOLLER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1987), vol. 10, page 6487
    - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, page 315
    - WELLS ET AL., PHILOS. TRANS. R. SOC. LONDON SERA., (1986), vol. 317, page 415
    - CREIGHTON, The Proteins, W.H. FREEMAN & CO.
    - CHOTHIA, 1., MOL. BIOL., (1976), vol. 150, page 1
    - T.E. CREIGHTON, Proteins: Structure and Molecular Properties, W.H. FREEMAN & CO., (1983), pages 79 - 86
    - APLIN AND WRISTON. CRC CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), pages 259 - 306
    - HAKIMUDDIN ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1987), vol. 259, page 52
    - EDGE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1981), vol. 118, page 131
    - THOTAKURA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 350
    - FIELD ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, pages 2159 - 2165
    - EVAN ET AL., MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 5, pages 3610 - 3616
    - PABORSKY ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1990), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 547 - 553
    - HOPP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1204 - 1210
    - MARTIN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 192 - 194
    - SKINNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 15163 - 15166
    - LUTZ-FREYERMUTH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 6393 - 6397
    - MERRIFIELD, J. AM. CREM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154
    - SHAW ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 23, page 315
    - GRAHAM; VAN DER EB, VIROLOGY, (1978), vol. 52, pages 456 - 457
    - VAN SOLINGEN ET AL., J. BACT., (1977), vol. 130, page 946
    - HSIAO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1979), vol. 76, page 3829
    - KEOWN ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), vol. 185, pages 527 - 537
    - MANSOUR ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 336, pages 348 - 352
    - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1980), vol. 77, page 4216
    - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 33, pages 243 - 251
    - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216
    - STINCHCOMB ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 282, page 39
    - KINGSMAN ET AL., GENE, (1979), vol. 7, page 141
    - TSCHEMPER ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 10, page 157
    - JONES, GENETICS, (1977), vol. 85, page 12
    - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1978), vol. 275, page 615
    - GOEDDEL ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, page 544
    - GOEDDEL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057
    - DEBOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25
    - HITZEMAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 2073
    - HESS ET AL., J. ADV. ENZYME REG., (1968), vol. 7, page 149
    - HOLLAND, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1978), vol. 17, page 4900
    - GETHING ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 293, pages 620 - 625
    - MANTEI ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 281, pages 40 - 46
    - THOMAS, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 5201 - 5205
    - DEUTSCHER, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1990), page 182
    - ZOLA, Monoclonal Antibodies: A Manual of Techniques, CRC PRESS, INC., (1987), pages L47 - L58
    - SMALL ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 642 - 648
    - Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC
    - CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOGY, page 3.15
    - CHAMBERS, C. A.; ALLISON, J. P., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, page 396
    - SCHWARTZ, R. H., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, page 1065
    - LINSEY, P. S.; LEDBETTER, J. A., ANNU. REV. LMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 11, page 19 1
    - JUNE. C. H. ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1994), vol. 15, page 321
    - JENKINS, M. K., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, page 405
    - WALUNAS, T. L. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, page 405
    - ALDERSON. M. E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 2219
    - HELLSTROM, I.; HELLSTROM, K. E., CRIT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 18, page 1
    - GRABBE, S.; SCHWARZ, T, IMMUN. TODAY, (1998), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 37 - 44
    - CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOGY
    - AUCHINCLOSS, H. JR.; SACHS, D. H., Fundamental Immunology, RAVEN PRESS., (1989), pages 889 - 992
    - TANABE, M. ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1994), vol. 58, page 23
    - TINUBU. S. A. ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1994), pages 4330 - 4338
    - BOLTON, C., MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (1995), vol. 1, page 143
    - DUNCAN. I. D. ET AL., MOLEC. MED TODAV, (1997), pages 554 - 561
    - ISSEKUTZ, A. C. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 88, page 569
    - WOLYNIEC. W. W. ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CELL MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 18, page 777
    - SCHON, M. P. ET AL., NAT. MED, (1997), vol. 3, page 183
    - NICKOLOFF, B. J. ET AL., AM. 1. PATH., (1995), vol. 146, page 580
    - VAN DER PUTTEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 6148 - 615
    - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 56, pages 313 - 321
    - LO., MOL. CEL.. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 1803 - 1814
    - LAVITRANO ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 57, pages 717 - 73
    - LASKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 623 - 636
    - THOMAS; CAPECCHI, CELL, (1987), vol. 51, page 503
    - LI ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, page 915
    - BRADLEY, Teratocarcinomas and Embryonic Stem Cells: A Practical Approach, IRL, (1987), pages 113 - 1521
    - DESMET. C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1996), vol. 93, page 7149
    - MELERO. I. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 3, page 682
    - KWON. E. D. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, page 8099
    - LYNCH. D. H. ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 3, page 625
    - FINN. O. J.; LOTZE. M. T.., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 21, page 114
    - HUNTER, CELL, (1991), vol. 64, page 1129
    - BISHOP, CELL, (1991), vol. 64, pages 235 - 248
    - ALITALO ET AL., ADV. CANCER RES., (1986), vol. 47, pages 235 - 281
    - SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 177 - 182
    - SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 707 - 712
    - SCHWAB ET AL., GENES CHROMOSOMES CANCER, (1990), vol. 1, pages 181 - 193
    - RAVDIN; CHAMNESS, GENE, (1995), vol. 159, pages 19 - 27
    - HYNES; STEM, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1994), vol. 1198, pages 165 - 184
    - BASELGA ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL, (1996), vol. 14, pages 737 - 744
    - FIELDS; SONG, NATURE_(LONDON, (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246
    - CHIEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 9578 - 958
    - CHEVRAY; NATHANS, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 89, pages 5789 - 5793
    - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - Goding, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103
    - KOZBOR,1., IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 133, page 3001
    - BRODEUR ET AL., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, MARCEL DEKKER. INC., (1987), pages 1 - 63
    - RIECHMANN, NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329
    - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOI., (1992), pages 593 - 596
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536
    - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581
    - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77
    - BOERNER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95
    - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859
    - MORRISON, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 812 - 13
    - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 51
    - NEUBERGER, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 826
    - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL, (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93
    - MILSTEIN; CUELLO, NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 539
    - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659
    - SURESH ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1986), vol. 121, page 21
    - CARON ET AL., J. EXP MED, (1992), vol. 176, pages 1191 - 1195
    - SHOPES, B., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2918 - 2922
    - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565
    - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 230
    - VITETTA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, page 1098
    - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 3688
    - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4030
    - MARTIN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, pages 286 - 288
    - GABIZON ET AL., 1. NATIONAL CANCER INST., (1989), vol. 81, no. 19, page 1484
    - MARASCO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 7889 - 7893
    - MARTIN-PADURA ET AL., 1. CELL BIOL, (1998), vol. 142, no. 1, pages 117 - 27
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 266, (1996), pages 460 - 480, URL: http://blast.wustUedu/blast/README.htmlJ
    - HOLMES ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 253, pages 1278 - 1280
    - ALTSHUL ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1996), vol. 266, pages 460 - 480
    - AUSUBEL ET AL., CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY
    - Current Protocol in Immunology, JOHN WILEY & SONS. INC.
    - SCAN, CLILL. LAB INVEST., (1968), vol. 97, pages 51 - 76
    - SPENCER ET AL., J. EXP. MED, (1998), vol. 187, pages 571 - 578
    - SKEHAN ET AL., J. NATL. CANCERLNST., (1990), vol. 82, pages 1107 - 1112
    - MONKS ET AL., 1. NATL. CANCER INST., (1991), vol. 83, pages 757 - 766
    - MONKS ET AL., BO.VD. CANCER: PRINC. PRACT. ONCOL. UPDATE, (1989), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1 - 12
    - BOLIVAR ET AL., GENE, (1977), vol. 2, page 95
    - THIMMAPPAYA ET AL., CELL, (1982), vol. 31, page 543
    - LUCAS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1996), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 1774 - 1779
    - RUPERT ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 175 - 179
    - CARTIER. J.L. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 7728 - 7737