EP2026624 - Transmission of protocol data units through the transparent radio link control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/08] | TRANSMISSION OF FIXED SIZE PROTOCOL DATA UNITS THROUGH THE TRANSPARENT RADIO LINK CONTROL | ||
[2011/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | [2013/48] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Core Wireless Licensing S.à.r.l. 16, avenue Pasteur 2310 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states 2011 Intellectual Property Asset Trust Wells Fargo Delaware Trust Company National Association 919 North Market Street, Suite 1600 Wilmington DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarkkinen, Sinikka Kisallinkuja 5 36200 Kangasala / FI | 02 /
Mikola, Juha Meritullinkatu 15 C 31 00170 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Rinne, Mikko J. Tallbergin puistotie 1 C 25 00200 Helsinki / FI | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017563.1 | 26.03.2001 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | US20000195676P | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 195676 P | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026624 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2026624 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2026624 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W92/04, H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04W28/06 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H04W28/065 (EP,US);
H04W92/04 (KR);
H04L12/00 (KR);
H04W92/045 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2009/08] | H04W72/12, H04W28/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Übertragung von PDUs durch einen transparenten Induktor | [2013/17] | English: | Transmission of protocol data units through the transparent radio link control | [2013/17] | French: | Transmission des PDU par le RLC transparent | [2013/17] |
Former [2009/08] | Übertragung von PDUs von fester Größe durch einen transparenten Induktor | ||
Former [2009/08] | TRANSMISSION OF FIXED SIZE PROTOCOL DATA UNITS THROUGH THE TRANSPARENT RADIO LINK CONTROL | ||
Former [2009/08] | Transmission des PDU de taille fixée par le RLC transparent | Examination procedure | 24.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01915601.7 / EP1285512 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010915601) is 25.08.2004 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | PT | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | GR | 28.02.2014 | LU | 26.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/30] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PT | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
LU | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9713353 (OMNIPOINT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 174, line 25 - page 178, line 18 *; | [X]WO9941872 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 1 - line 10 *; | [XA]WO9963703 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1 * page 11, line 5 - page 18, line 4; figure - * [A] 2-21; | [XP]WO0021253 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [XP] 1 * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 16; figure - *; | [E]WO0137507 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [E] 1,6,8,10,15 * page 13, line 1 - page 45, line 2; figure - *; | [E]WO0161897 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [E] 1,6,8,10,15* page 3, line 7 - page 14, line 12; figure - *; | [A] - ENEROTH G ET AL, "ATM TRANSPORT IN CELLULAR NETWORKS", ISS '97. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM). GLOBAL NETWORK EVOLUTION: CONVERGENCE OR COLLISION? TORONTO, SEPT. 21 - 26, 1997, ISS. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM), TORONTO, P, (19970921), vol. 2, pages 139 - 146, XP000704463 [A] 1,6,8,10,15 * see complete article * |