Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020607

EP2020607 - Determining the spatio-temporal and kinematic parameters of a signal receiver and its clock by information fusion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2011  [2011/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SiRF Technology, Inc.
217 Devcon Drive
San Jose, CA 95112 / US
[2009/12]
Former [2009/06]For all designated states
SiRF Technology Holdings, Inc.
217 Devcon Drive
San Jose, CA 95112 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sahai, Anant
3001 Derby Street, Unit A
Berkeley, CA 95705 / US
02 / Chou, Andrew
4517 Carlyle Court 4309
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
03 / Mann, Wallace
16 Madera Way
Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US
04 / Casadei, Stefano
1550 Bay Street, Apt. 337
San Francisco, CA 94123 / US
 [2009/29]
Former [2009/06]01 / Sahai, Anant
3001 Derby Street, Unit A
Berkeley, CA 95705 / US
02 / Chou, Andrew
1501 W. Hillsdale Blvds 211
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
03 / Mann, Wallace
16 Madera Way
Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US
04 / Casadei, Stefano
1550 Bay Street, Apt. 337
San Francisco, CA 94123 / US
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2009/06]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date08018093.821.06.2002
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateUS2001088822922.06.2001         Original published format: US 888229
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020607
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2020607
Date:17.06.2009
[2009/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020607
Date:23.12.2009
[2009/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01S1/00
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2010/35]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bestimmung der Raum-Zeit- und Kinematikparameter eines Signalempfängers und dessen Taktgeber mittels Informationsverschmelzung[2009/06]
English:Determining the spatio-temporal and kinematic parameters of a signal receiver and its clock by information fusion[2009/06]
French:Détermination des paramètres spatio-temporels et cinétiques d'un récepteur de signal et son horloge par la fusion d'informations[2009/06]
Examination procedure24.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
24.06.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.08.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
04.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/27]
10.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/27]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02744558.4  / EP1399758
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020744558) is  11.04.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201009   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6133873  (KRASNER NORMAN F [US]) [X] 1-18 * figures 5,6 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 6 * * column 13, line 39 - column 15, line 52 *;
 [A]EP1083440  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * figures 4,6 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] , [0025] , [0028] , [0030] , [0033] *;
 [A]US6118808  (TIEMANN JEROME JOHNSON [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *