Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2017303

EP2017303 - Polymer molding compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2011/16]
Former [2009/04]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
Washington Street - 1790 Building
Midland MI 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wilson, Debra R.
4010 N. Barnett Way
Missouri City TX 77459 / US
02 / Michie, William James Jr.
9111 S. Fitzgerald Way
Missouri City TX 77459-6405 / US
03 / Petsalis, Spyro P.
22506 Wolff Meadow Lane
Katy TX 77484 / US
 [2009/04]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/04]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08018656.205.05.2005
[2009/04]
Priority number, dateUS20040568487P06.05.2004         Original published format: US 568487 P
US2005012135303.05.2005         Original published format: US 121353
[2009/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2017303
Date:21.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2017303
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/08, B65D39/00
[2009/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/04]
TitleGerman:Polymerspritzgusszusammensetzungen[2009/04]
English:Polymer molding compositions[2009/04]
French:Compositions de moulage de polymère[2009/04]
Examination procedure04.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/30]
13.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2014Fee for grant paid
23.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05779422.4  / EP1761599
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050779422) is  24.05.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.03.2015  13.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Raboin, Jean-Christophe
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
 [2016/08]
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  10.03.2015   
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Leyder, Francis
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Patent Department
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
15.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1443/17
24.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
05.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.05.2005
AT11.06.2014
BE11.06.2014
BG11.06.2014
CY11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
DK11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
MC11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SI11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
TR11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
IE05.05.2015
LU05.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/20]AT11.06.2014
BE11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
DK11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
MC11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SI11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
IE05.05.2015
LU05.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2016/06]AT11.06.2014
BE11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
DK11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
MC11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SI11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
LU05.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2015/36]AT11.06.2014
BE11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
DK11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SI11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
Former [2015/30]AT11.06.2014
BE11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
DK11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
DK11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT11.06.2014
CZ11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
NL11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
IS11.10.2014
PT13.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CZ11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
PL11.06.2014
RO11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
PT13.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CZ11.06.2014
EE11.06.2014
ES11.06.2014
FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
SK11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
Former [2014/50]FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
SE11.06.2014
GR12.09.2014
Former [2014/49]FI11.06.2014
LT11.06.2014
Former [2014/48]LT11.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US3507942  (LYNCH ROBERT F) [X] 1-3,6,8,15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 40,47 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US4522987  (HOGAN JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,13 * abstract * * columns 11,12; table IB *;
 [XA]GB858584  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO) [X] 1-4,6,9,11 * abstract * * page 6; table 6 * [A] 13;
 [XA]US4919834  (CHEN LOREN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,15 * abstract * * column 4 * [A] 12,13;
 [XA]US5227366  (COLBORN DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15 * column 6 * [A] 11-14
by applicantUS5981664
 US4302565
 US5290745
 EP0771820
 WO2004094489
 EP0640625
 US4100105
 US6022933
 US5844045
 US5869575
 US6448341
 US6566446
 US6538070
 US4076698
 US5977251
 WO9736942
 US4621952
 US4482687
 US4543399
 US4588790
 US5352749
 US4814135
 US4857600
 US5076988
 US5153382
 US6139931
 US5598940
 US6382445
 US5000992
 US4744478
 US4807772
 US4846362
 US4984703
 US5137164
 US4872573
 US5292845
    - WILLIAMS; WARD, JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, POLYMER LETTERS, (1968), vol. 6, page 621
    - RANDALL, REV. MACROMOL. CHEM. CHYS., vol. C29, no. 2, 3, pages 285 - 297
    - ANANTAWARASKUL, SIRIPON; SOARES, JOAO B. P.; WOOD-ADAMS, PAULA M., "Department of Chemical Engineering, McGill University", CAN. MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, (2004), vol. 206, pages 57 - 68
    - ZHANG, YU-DONG ET AL., "Beijing Research Institute of Chemical Industry", SINOPEC, BEIJING, PEOP. REP. CHINA. POLYMER JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 35, no. 7, pages 551 - 559
    - ANANTAWARASKUL, SIRIPON ET AL., "Department of Chemical Engineering, McGill University", CAN. POLYMER, (2003), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 2393 - 2401
    - SARZOTTI, DEBORAH M.; SOARES, JOAO B.P.; PENLIDIS, ALEXANDER, "Institute for Polymer Research, Department of Chemical Engineering, University of Waterloo", CAN. JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, PART B: POLYMER PHYSICS, (2002), vol. 40, no. 23, pages 2595 - 2611
 US20040568487