Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2055589

EP2055589 - Method for controlling regenerative braking in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.03.2015  [2015/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations LLC
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US
For all designated states
Daimler AG
70546 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Chrysler LLC
800 Chrysler Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2757 / US
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations LLC
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US
For all designated states
Daimler AG
70546 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Chrysler LLC
800 Chrysler Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2757 / US
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
Former [2012/06]For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations LLC
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US
For all designated states
Daimler AG
70546 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Chrysler LLC
800 Chrysler Drive
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2757 / US
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80788 München / DE
Former [2011/30]For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations LLC
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US
Former [2009/19]For all designated states
GM Global Technology Operations, Inc.
300 Renaissance Center
Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Minarcin, Monika, A.
20650 Northville Place Drive No. 1905
Northville MI 48167-2937 / US
02 / Logan, Jon, K.
1181 Thorn Ridge Drive
Howell MI 48843 / US
03 / Wang, Jian, M.
1724 Bent Pine Ct.
Ann Arbor MI 48108 / US
04 / Rask, Eric, M.
2603 N. Connecticut
Royal Oak Michigan 48073 / US
 [2009/19]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2009/19]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date08019086.131.10.2008
[2009/19]
Priority number, dateUS20070985223P03.11.2007         Original published format: US 985223 P
US2008026026329.10.2008         Original published format: US 260263
[2009/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2055589
Date:06.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2055589
Date:13.04.2011
[2011/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2055589
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60W20/00, B60W30/18, B60K1/02, B60K6/26, B60K6/365, B60K6/445, B60K6/547, // B60W10/06, B60W10/08
[2009/19]
Designated contracting statesDE [2011/51]
Former [2009/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung der regenerativen Bremsung in einem Fahrzeug[2009/19]
English:Method for controlling regenerative braking in a vehicle[2009/19]
French:Procédé de contrôle de freinage par récupération dans un véhicule[2009/19]
Examination procedure29.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/45]
16.10.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.11.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2014Fee for grant paid
17.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2013
Opposition(s)06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2386879  (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 35 * * page 5, lines 1-6,19-25 * * page 5, line 35 - page 10, line 6 * * page 7, lines 12-33 * * page 8, lines 21-30 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 26 * * page 17, lines 19-35 * * page 19, line 29 - page 20, line 23 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 3-12;
 [X]EP1306263  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016]; figure - *;
 [X]US2002116099  (TABATA ATSUSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0076] - [0079] - [0092] - [0094] *;
 [XA]WO2006080570  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; ABE TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-12
by applicantUS20070985223