Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2182594

EP2182594 - Electrical connection device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2011
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2011  [2011/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
5725 Delphi Drive
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/18]For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
5725 Delphi Drive
Troy, Michigan 48007 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Le Solleu, Jean-Pierre
2 rue de Haguenau
67000 Strasbourg / FR
02 / Hassan, Bahman
7 place Lamartine
67400 Illkirch / FR
03 / Kürschner, Sven
Baccusweg 4
55597 Wöllstein / DE
 [2010/18]
Representative(s)Becker, Bernd
Patentanwälte
BECKER & AUE
Saarlandstrasse 66
55411 Bingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/18]Becker, Bernd
Patentanwälte Becker & Aue Gaustrasse 20
55411 Bingen / DE
Application number, filing date08019171.103.11.2008
[2010/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2182594
Date:05.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01R35/04
[2010/18]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2011/02]
Former [2010/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrische Verbindungseinrichtung[2010/18]
English:Electrical connection device[2010/18]
French:Dispositif de raccordement électrique[2010/18]
Examination procedure06.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/18]
14.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE102006056503  (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-8;
 [XA]US5314344  (IDA YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, lines 15-68 * * column 7, lines 1-68; figures 8-10(e) * [A] 2-8;
 [AD]US2008014775  (YOSHIMURA KENJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-8 * column 6, lines 29-65; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2346743  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * pages 13-19; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]JP2004222369  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102007024167