Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2047867 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2047867



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 590
28.03.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.05.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.02.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.02.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 78
18.02.2013 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.01.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
21.01.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
21.01.2013 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
21.01.2013 Description Search / examination 2
21.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2013 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.10.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 78
06.06.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.04.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
23.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.11.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.11.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.05.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.05.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
03.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
03.05.2010 Description Search / examination 1
03.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.05.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.04.2010 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
07.04.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
08.03.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.10.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.04.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.03.2009 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
18.03.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
16.03.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.03.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
16.03.2009 European search report Search / examination 4
03.03.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.02.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.02.2009 Drawings Search / examination 1
07.02.2009 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
07.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.02.2009 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
07.02.2009 Sequence listing Search / examination 29
03.02.2009 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Sequence listing Search / examination 29
24.11.2008 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
24.11.2008 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
11.11.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
08.11.2008 Annex Search / examination 80
08.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
04.11.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Description Search / examination 58
04.11.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.11.2008 Drawings Search / examination 19
04.11.2008 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
25.05.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74