Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2047867


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
11.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
28.03.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
03.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.02.2014  [2014/06]
08.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2013  [2013/50]
01.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2013  [2013/49]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
18.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2013  [2013/47]
28.05.2013 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
19.04.2013 (Expected) grant published on  22.05.2013  [2013/21]
10.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.02.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.02.2013 Change - representative published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
15.10.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.06.2012 Change - applicant published on  11.07.2012  [2012/28]
11.05.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.11.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.09.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.10.2010  [2010/43]
08.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.05.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.03.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.11.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  23.12.2009  [2009/52]
30.10.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.10.2009 First examination report
16.10.2009 Request for examination filed published on  18.11.2009  [2009/47]
13.10.2009 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
17.06.2009 Change: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.03.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.04.2009  [2009/16]
11.11.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid