Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2047867

EP2047867 - ACE2 activation for treatment of heart, lung and kidney disease and hypertension [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2014
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apeiron Biologics AG
Campus-Vienna-Biocenter 5
1030 Wien / AT
[2013/21]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Apeiron Biologics AG
Campus-Vienna-Biocenter 5
1030 Wien / AT
Former [2009/16]For all designated states
University Health Network
Room 7-504, 610 University Avenue Toronto
Ontario M5G 2M9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Crackower, Michael A.
1764 Rue du Violon
St. Lazare, Quebec J7T 3J8 / CA
02 / Penninger, Joseph M
Himmelhofgasse 62
1130 Vienna / AT
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Le Mière, Jennifer Louise , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Bentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Le Mière, Jennifer Louise , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Services Unlimited
Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Bentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2009/16]Alge, Daniel
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date08019249.519.06.2003
[2009/16]
Priority number, dateUS20020389709P19.06.2002         Original published format: US 389709 P
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2047867
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2047867
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00, C12N9/64, A61K38/48
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
Extension statesLT08.10.2009
LV08.10.2009
TitleGerman:ACE2-Aktivierung zur Behandlung von Herz-, Lungen- und Nierenkrankheiten und Hochdruck[2009/16]
English:ACE2 activation for treatment of heart, lung and kidney disease and hypertension[2009/16]
French:Activation d'ACE2 pour le traitement de maladies du coeur, des poumons et des reins et de l'hypertension[2009/16]
Examination procedure08.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/47]
03.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2013Fee for grant paid
03.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03729747.0  / EP1515752
Divisional application(s)EP10178474.2  / EP2332582
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030729747) is  26.05.2006
Opposition(s)25.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
04.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
04.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
01.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
08.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.06.2003
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
IE19.06.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
TR22.05.2013
IE19.06.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2015/30]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
IE19.06.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
IE19.06.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
GR23.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT22.05.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]PT23.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0212471  (ACTON SUSAN ;HSIEH FRANK Y (US); ROBISON KEITH E (US); MILLENNIUM) [X] 1-15 * page 4, lines 28,29 * * page 7, line 18 - page 11, line 29 * * SEQ ID No 1;; figure 13 * * claims 1,12,16,21,38-40,42 * * examples 10-14 *;
 [Y]  - DONOGHUE MARY ET AL, "A novel angiotensin-converting enzyme-related carboxypeptidase (ACE2) converts angiotensin I to angiotensin 1-9", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, GRUNE AND STRATTON, BALTIMORE, US, (20000901), vol. 87, no. 5, ISSN 0009-7330, pages e1 - e9, XP002207553 [Y] 1-15 * page 7, column R, lines 17-24 * * page 8, column R, paragraph 3 - page 9, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 3,10 *
 [Y]  - YAGIL CHANA ET AL, "Role of chromosome X in the Sabra rat model of salt-sensitive hypertension", HYPERTENSION (BALTIMORE), (199901), vol. 33, no. 1 PART 2, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 261 - 265, XP002258712 [Y] 1-15 * figure 1; tables 1,2 *
 [PX]  - CRACKOWER MICHAEL A ET AL, "Angiotensin-converting enzyme 2 is an essential regulator of heart function", NATURE (LONDON), (20020620), vol. 417, no. 6891, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 822 - 828, XP002258713 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature00786
 [A]  - GRAMATIKOFF K., "Angiotensin-converting enzyme 2 regulates heart function", BIOCARTA, (200203), URL: WWW.BIOCARTA.COM/PATHFILES/H_ACE2PATHWAY.ASP, XP002258714 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *