Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026546

EP2026546 - Apparatus comprising a plug connector for connecting to media player [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]Media player system
[2009/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2012/48]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fadell, Anthony M.
290 S. Balsamin Way
Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US
02 / Zadesky, Stephen Paul
3366 Brittan Avenue
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
03 / Filson, John Benjamin
22350 Creston Drive
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
 [2009/14]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2009/08]Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date08019373.318.03.2004
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2003042349025.04.2003         Original published format: US 423490
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026546
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026546
Date:06.05.2009
[2009/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026546
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01R25/00, H02J7/00, G06F1/16, B60R11/02, H04M1/04
[2012/24]
Former International [2009/08]H04M1/725, B60R11/02, G11B20/10, G11B27/10, G06F1/16, H04M1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Apparat beinhaltend einen Anschlussstecker zur Verbindung mit einem Medienabspielgerät[2012/24]
English:Apparatus comprising a plug connector for connecting to media player[2012/24]
French:Appareil comprenant un connecteur pour se connecter à un lecteur multimédia[2012/24]
Former [2009/08]Medienabspielsystem
Former [2009/08]Media player system
Former [2009/08]Système lecteur multimédia
Examination procedure05.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
01.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2012Fee for grant paid
11.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04760202.4  / EP1618675
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040760202) is  28.08.2008
Opposition(s)29.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2004
AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
IE18.03.2013
LU18.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
TR28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
IE18.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2014/08]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
IE18.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2014/07]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
IE18.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/52]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CY28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/47]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
IT28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
RO28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
CZ28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
EE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
SK28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
DK28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
BG28.02.2013
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT28.11.2012
BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
PT28.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE28.11.2012
FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
SI28.11.2012
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
GR01.03.2013
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI28.11.2012
PL28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI28.11.2012
SE28.11.2012
ES11.03.2013
Former [2013/21]SE28.11.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO02075517  (GCV1 INC [US]) [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 5, line 16 - line 17 * * page 22, line 14 - page 24, line 4 * * figures 8-1,8-2 * [Y] 2-5,7-23;
 [Y]US2002032042  (POPLAWSKY RALPH C [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7-23 * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0154] * * figures 1A,3 *;
 [A]US5983073  (DITZIK RICHARD J [US]) [A] 2,4,5,19,20 * column 12, line 65 - line 67 *;
 [A]GB2362237  (SMITH GRAEME ROY [GB]) [A] 2,4,5,19,20 * claim 5 *;
 [A]US2002194468  (BETTS-LACROIX JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 2,4,5,19,20 * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0174] * * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0182] *;
 [A]US2002180803  (KAPLAN JON [US], et al) [A] 2,4,5,19,20 * paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]DE10131299  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2,4,5,19,20 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * figure 1 *
by applicantUS2002194468
 US2002006748