Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2083569

EP2083569 - Open cable application platform set-top box (STB) personal profiles and communications applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.12.2011  [2011/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avaya Inc.
211 Mount Airy Road
Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US
[2009/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Campagna, Theresa
111 Kingfield Road
Philadelphia, PA 19115 / US
02 / Chavez, David Lee Jr.
761 Eldorado Boulevard 1922
Broomfield, CO 80021 / US
03 / Weber, Gregory, D.
4110 W. 107th Drive
Westminster, CO 80031 / US
 [2009/31]
Representative(s)Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Lurgiallee 12
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Hafner-Tergau-Walkenhorst
Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107
60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE
Former [2009/31]Walkenhorst, Andreas
Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date08019405.306.11.2008
[2009/31]
Priority number, dateUS20080022723P22.01.2008         Original published format: US 22723 P
US2008005060518.03.2008         Original published format: US 50605
[2009/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2083569
Date:29.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16, H04N7/173
[2009/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/14]
Former [2009/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anwendungsplattform mit offenem Kabel (OCAP) und auf einem Digitalempfänger (STB) basierte persönliche Profil- und Kommunikationsanwendungen[2009/31]
English:Open cable application platform set-top box (STB) personal profiles and communications applications[2009/31]
French:Profils personnels de décodeurs (STB) à plateforme d'application à câble ouvert et applications de communications[2009/31]
Examination procedure20.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/09]
30.01.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
25.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/52]
15.11.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2011
15.11.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0005889  (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * page 2, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 11 - line 14 * * page 15, line 6 - line 14; figure 1 * * page 15, line 30 - line 31; figure 1 * * page 16, line 9 - line 17; figure 1 * * page 18, line 31 - page 19, line 1 * * page 19, line 30 - line 31 * * page 20, line 28 - page 21, line 4 * * page 38, line 7 - line 9 * * page 39, line 28 - line 30 * * figure 21b *;
 [A]WO0117250  (ISMAIL LABEEB K [US]; GOGOI AMAR N [US]; MEHTA MANU [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * page 4, line 12 - line 18 * * page 44, line 29 - line 30 * * page 46, line 1 - line 5 *;
 [A]WO0143424  (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * page 5, line 1 - line 9 * * page 23, line 33 - page 24, line 6; figure 5 *;
 [A]US7237251  (OZ RAN [IL] ET AL) [A] 1,2,4-9 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 10 * * column 5, line 49 - line 58 * * column 6, line 30 - line 35 *