Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022862

EP2022862 - Method of diagnosing of exposure to toxic agents by measuring distinct pattern in the levels of expression of specific genes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WRAIR (Walter Reed Army Institute of Research)
14th and Dahlia Streets, N.W.
Washington, DC 20307 / US
[2015/16]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
WRAIR (Walter Reed Army Institute of Research)
14th and Dahlia Streets, N.W.
Washington, DC 20307 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Das, Rina
2613 Northrup Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / Jett, Marti
3446 Oakwood Terrace, NW
Washington DC 20307 / US
03 / Mendis, Chanaka
6154 Willston Drive
Apt. 201
Falls Church, VA 22044 / US
 [2015/16]
Former [2009/07]01 / Das, Rina
2613 Northrup Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / Jett, Marti
3446 Oakwood Terrace, NW
Washington DC 20307 / US
03 / Mendis, Chanaka
6154 Willston Drive Apt. 201
Falls Church, VA 22044 / US
Representative(s)Lord, Hilton David
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[2015/16]
Former [2013/50]Lord, Hilton David
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2013/11]Icely, Dominic Michael
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House (2nd Floor)
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
Former [2009/07]Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date08019667.801.02.2000
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS19990118776P05.02.1999         Original published format: US 118776 P
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022862
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022862
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12Q1/02, G01N33/68, A61P43/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2015/16]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Diagnose auf Belastung mit Giftstoffen durch Messung des distinktiven Musters in den Stufen der Expression von spezifischen Genen[2009/07]
English:Method of diagnosing of exposure to toxic agents by measuring distinct pattern in the levels of expression of specific genes[2009/07]
French:Procédé pour le diagnostic d'exposition aux agents toxiques par la mesure de motifs différents dans les niveaux d'expression de gènes spécifiques[2009/07]
Examination procedure14.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
08.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2015Fee for grant paid
05.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP00905950.2  / EP1147224
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000905950) is  19.01.2004
Opposition(s)18.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
25.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201314   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
CY15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
[2018/28]
Former [2017/40]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
SE15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/42]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
MC15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/37]AT15.04.2015
BE15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/21]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
IT15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.04.2015
DK15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT15.04.2015
ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES15.04.2015
FI15.04.2015
NL15.04.2015
GR16.07.2015
PT17.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL15.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]  SCHAFER P H ET AL., "T cell activation signals up-regulate p38 mitogen-activated protein kinase activity and induce TNF-alpha production in a manner distinct from LPS avtivation of monocytes", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 162, pages 659 - 668, XP002508486 [X] 2 * the whole document *
 [X]  PALKAMA T AND HURME M, "Signal transduction mechanisms of HLA-DR-mediated interleukin-1beta production in human monocytes", HUMAN IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 36, pages 259 - 267, XP002508487 [X] 3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0198-8859(93)90133-L
 [X]  MATSUYAMA S ET AL., "HLA class II molecule-mediated signal transduction mechanism responsible for the expression of interleukin-1beta and tumor necrosis factor-alpha genes induced by a staphylococcal superantigen", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 23, XP002508488 [X] 3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830231223
by applicant   KRIEGLER ET AL., CELL, (1988), vol. 53, pages 45 - 53,
    TRACEY ET AL., ANNU. REV. CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 9, pages 317 - 343,
    SIDHU ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER., (1993), vol. 57, pages 79 - 128,
    HOGG ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, pages 383 - 589,
    MACKAY ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1993), vol. 1, pages 99 - 104,
    BJORNDAHL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 1, pages 4094 - 4098,
    CEBRIAN ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 19, pages 809 - 816,
    HAMANN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 4920 - 4928,
    TESTI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 150, pages 4920 - 4924,
    MICHAEL THOR POPE, Heteropoly and Isopoly Oxometalateds, SPRINGER VERLAG,
    YUEN AR ET AL., "Phase I study of an antisense oligonucleotide to protein kinase C-alpha (ISIS 3521/CGP 64128A) in patients with cancer", CLIN CANCER RES 1999 NOV., (1999), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 3357 - 63,
    HAMMAMEIH, FASEB J.,
    SHI Q ET AL., "Constitutive and inducible interleukin 8 expression by hypoxia and acidosis renders human pancreatic cancer cells more tumorigenic and metastatic", CLIN CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 3711 - 21,
    CHO-CHUNG YS, "Antisense DNA-targeting protein kinase A-RIA subunit: a novel approach to cancer treatment", FRONT BIOSCI, (1999), vol. 4, pages 898 - 907,
    TIAN XX ET AL., "Altered expression of the suppressors PML and p53 in glioblastoma cells with the antisense-EGF-receptor", BR J CANCER, (1999), vol. 81, no. 6, pages 994 - 1001,
    PUGIN, J.; C. C. SCHURER-MALY; D. LETURCQ, "Lipopolysaccharide activation of human endothelial and epithelial cells is mediated by lipopolysaccharide-binding protein and soluble CD 14", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1993), vol. 90, pages 2744 - 2748,
    WRIGHT, S. D.; R. A. RAMOS; P. S. TOBIAS, "CD 14, a receptor for complexes of lipopolysaccharide (LPS) and LPS binding protein", SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1431 - 1433,
    JETT, M. ET AL., "Identification of staphylococcal enterotoxin B sequences important for induction of lymphocyte proliferation by using synthetic peptide fragments of the toxin", INFECT IMMUN., (1994), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 3408 - 15,
    NEILL, R. J. ET AL., "Mitogenic activities of amino acid substitution mutants of staphylococcal enterotoxin B in human and mouse lymphocyte cultures", INFECT IMMUN., (1996), vol. 64, no. 8, pages 3007 - 15,
    YAN, A.; G. YANG; M. JETT., "Cholera toxin induces TNF-a production by human monocytes via CAMP independent pathways", FASEB J., (1997), vol. 10, page 2746,
    YAN, "Protein kinase C is involved in SEB induced TNF-a production", FASEB J., (1997), vol. 10, page 1922,
    WALZ ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1989), vol. 170, no. 5, pages 1745 - 1750,
    DOEGE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 894 - 902,
    DOEGE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1987), vol. 262, pages 17757 - 17767,
    NAKAZONA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10045 - 10048,
    ABRAHAMSSON ET AL., CIRC. RES., (1992), vol. 70, pages 264 - 271,
    REDNI ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1988), vol. 252, pages 515 - 519,
    SPERBER ET AL., CLIN DEGN LAB IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 4, pages 473 - 477,
    KERAKAUMER ET AL., MIL. MED., (1997), vol. 9, pages 612 - 615,
    COLBERT ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1997), vol. 100, pages 1958 - 1968,
    WANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI.USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 5510 - 5514,
    BOURNE ET AL., CELL, (1988), vol. 53, pages 669 - 671,