Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2189961

EP2189961 - Coordination and/or implementing teaching units used for teaching purposes with optical and/or acoustic teaching content [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
08.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vodafone Holding GmbH
Mannesmannufer 2
40027 Düsseldorf / DE
[2010/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Holzberg, Jan
Kasernenstr. 71
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / Altareva, Evgniya, Dr.
Goethestr. 30
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / Steil, Melissa
Schwerinstr. 64
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2010/21]
Representative(s)Ring & Weisbrodt
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Hohe Strasse 33
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/21]Ring & Weisbrodt
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date08019720.512.11.2008
[2010/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2189961
Date:26.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:G09B7/00
[2010/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/21]
TitleGerman:Koordination und/oder Durchführung von Unterrichtzwecken dienenden Lehreinheiten mit optischen und/oder akustischen Lehrinhalten[2010/21]
English:Coordination and/or implementing teaching units used for teaching purposes with optical and/or acoustic teaching content[2010/21]
French:Coordination et/ou exécution d'unités d'apprentissage servant à des cours dotées de contenus d'apprentissage optiques et/ou acoustiques[2010/21]
Examination procedure19.11.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
30.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.01.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.03.2015Appeal received No.  T1041/15
05.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[L]  - Die in der Anmeldung (Art 92 EPÜ) definierten technischen Aspekte werden als allgemein bekannt angesehen. Wegen ihrer Bekanntheit wird kein schriftlicher Nachweis für notwendig erachtet. Weitere Einzelheiten finden sich in der beiliegenden Stellungnahme und in der unterhalb angegebenen Referenz., XP002456252 [L] 1-15