EP2189961 - Coordination and/or implementing teaching units used for teaching purposes with optical and/or acoustic teaching content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzberg, Jan Kasernenstr. 71 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Altareva, Evgniya, Dr. Goethestr. 30 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Steil, Melissa Schwerinstr. 64 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Weisbrodt, Bernd, et al Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Straße 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Ring & Weisbrodt Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Hohe Strasse 33 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019720.5 | 12.11.2008 | [2010/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189961 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09B7/00 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
G09B7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Koordination und/oder Durchführung von Unterrichtzwecken dienenden Lehreinheiten mit optischen und/oder akustischen Lehrinhalten | [2010/21] | English: | Coordination and/or implementing teaching units used for teaching purposes with optical and/or acoustic teaching content | [2010/21] | French: | Coordination et/ou exécution d'unités d'apprentissage servant à des cours dotées de contenus d'apprentissage optiques et/ou acoustiques | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 30.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/37] | 05.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.07.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/37] | Appeal following examination | 05.03.2015 | Appeal received No. T1041/15 | 05.05.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.07.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - Die in der Anmeldung (Art 92 EPÜ) definierten technischen Aspekte werden als allgemein bekannt angesehen. Wegen ihrer Bekanntheit wird kein schriftlicher Nachweis für notwendig erachtet. Weitere Einzelheiten finden sich in der beiliegenden Stellungnahme und in der unterhalb angegebenen Referenz., XP002456252 [L] 1-15 |