Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2060863

EP2060863 - Coating film drying method and coating film drying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
For all designated states
Taikisha, Ltd.
Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building
6-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2 chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2013/33]
Former [2009/21]For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
For all designated states
Taikisha, Ltd.
6-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Horisawa, Satoshi
c/o Taikisha Ltd
Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building
6-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Tooka, Sigetaka
c/o Taikisha Ltd
Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building
6-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Ishida, Kouzou
c/o Taikisha Ltd
Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building
6-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Matsuda, Takaomi
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
05 / Sakoda, Toshiyuki
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
06 / Kanda, Teruo
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
07 / Koga, Kazuhi
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
 [2013/33]
Former [2009/21]01 / Horisawa, Satoshi
c/o Taikisha Ltd Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Tooka, Sigetaka
c/o Taikisha Ltd Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Ishida, Kouzou
c/o Taikisha Ltd Shinjuku-Sumitomo Building Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Matsuda, Takaomi
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shichi Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
05 / Sakoda, Toshiyuki
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shichi Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
06 / Kanda, Teruo
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shichi Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
07 / Koga, Kazuhi
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shichi Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2009/21]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date08019768.412.11.2008
[2009/21]
Priority number, dateJP2007029659715.11.2007         Original published format: JP 2007296597
[2009/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2060863
Date:20.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2060863
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:F26B21/00, F26B3/28, F26B15/12
[2013/10]
Former International [2009/21]F26B3/28, F26B15/12
Designated contracting statesDE [2010/04]
Former [2009/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Beschichtungsfilm Trocknungsmethode und Beschichtungsfilm Trocknungsapparat[2009/21]
English:Coating film drying method and coating film drying apparatus[2009/21]
French:Méthode de séchage de film de revêtement et appareil de séchage de film de revêtement[2009/21]
Examination procedure19.11.2009Examination requested  [2009/53]
21.11.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
02.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2013Fee for grant paid
04.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.05.2014  28.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Otto-Dürr-Strasse 9
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 [2017/08]
Former [2015/27]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2014  28.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Carl-Benz-Strasse 34
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2014/27]
Opponent(s)01  09.05.2014  28.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dürr Systems GmbH
Carl-Benz-Strasse 34
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
26.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
06.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.07.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition21.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0016/17
20.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
12.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2004043156  (EMCH DONALDSON J [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,11,13 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0011] - [0015] - [0028] , [0034] , [0044] - [0049] - [0054] - [0059] - [0064] , [0068] * [Y] 3,6,9,10,12;
 [XA]EP1762802  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,11 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0016] , [0025] , [0031] , [0034] , [0037] * [A] 2,3,5,9;
 [XAY]DE3515600  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [X] 8,11 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 45 - line 57 * * column 2, line 7 - line 30 * * column 3, line 5 - line 14 * * column 3, line 33 - line 34 * [A] 1,4 [Y] 10;
 [XA]WO9621833  (ABB PAINT FINISHING INC [US]) [X] 8 * figures 1,5a-5c * * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 11 - line 17 * * page 2, line 4 - line 12 * * page 8, line 16 - line 18 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 16 * [A] 1,3,9,11;
 [XAY]DE19941184  (FLAEKT AB [SE]) [X] 8 * figures 6,7 * * column 1, line 5 - line 60 * * column 2, line 58 - line 61 * * column 7, line 24 - line 46 * * column 8, line 16 - line 58 * [A] 1 [Y] 6,12;
 [Y]US2660723  (JULES DELAMARRE EMILE, et al) [Y] 3,9 * figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * column 1, line 18 - line 25 * * column 1, line 34 - line 43 * * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 15 *;
 [A]US5868562  (WATANABE MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,8,12 * figures 1,4 * * column 3, line 52 - line 65 * * column 5, line 10 - line 26 * * column 7, line 35 - line 44 *;
 [DA]US6062850  (INO MASANORI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,6,8,12 * figures 1-3,5,7,11 * * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 67 *
by applicantUS2004043156
 EP1762802
 DE3515600